EP2531463 - HYPERVALENT RADIOACTIVE ASTATINE OR IODINE COMPOUNDS, AND PREPARATION METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université de Nantes 1, quai de Tourville 44000 Nantes / FR | For all designated states CHU Nantes 5 allée de l'Ile Gloriette 44093 Nantes Cedex 1 / FR | [2017/44] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA SANTE ET DE LA RECHERCHE MEDICALE (INSERM) 101, rue de Tolbiac 75013 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Université de Nantes 1, quai de Tourville 44000 Nantes / FR | |||
For all designated states Chu Nantes 5 allée de l'Ile Gloriette 44093 Nantes Cedex 1 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GESTIN, Jean-François Unité Inserm 892 Institut De Recherche Therapeutique 8 Quai Moncousu - BP70721 F-44007 Nantes Cedex 1 / FR | 02 /
GUERARD, François Unité Inserm 892 Institut De Recherche Therapeutique 8 Quai Moncousu - BP70721 F-44007 Nantes Cedex 1 / FR | 03 /
FAIVRE-CHAUVET, Alain Unité Inserm 892 Institut De Recherche Therapeutique 8 Quai Moncousu - BP70721 F-44007 Nantes Cedex 1 / FR | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2017/44] |
Former [2012/50] | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11703417.3 | 02.02.2011 | [2017/44] | WO2011EP51480 | Priority number, date | EP20100305110 | 03.02.2010 Original published format: EP 10305110 | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011095517 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2531463 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2531463 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D347/00, C07C213/00, C07C213/02, C07D421/12, C07F7/22, C07B59/00 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
C07B59/002 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
C07C213/00 (EP,US);
C07C213/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C213/00, C07C215/68 (EP,US);
C07C213/00, C07C217/48 (US,EP);
C07C213/02, C07C215/68 (US,EP);
C07C213/02, C07C217/48 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2012/50] | C07B59/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Radioaktive Hypervalenzastatin- oder -iodinverbindungen und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2017/18] | English: | HYPERVALENT RADIOACTIVE ASTATINE OR IODINE COMPOUNDS, AND PREPARATION METHODS THEREOF | [2012/50] | French: | Composés d'astate ou d'iode radioactif hypervalent et procédés de préparation correspondants | [2017/18] |
Former [2012/50] | RADIOAKTIVE HYPERVALENZASTATIN- ODER -IODINVERBINDUNGEN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2012/50] | COMPOSÉS HYPERVALENTS D'ASTATINE OU D'IODE RADIOACTIF, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 26.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 22.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.02.2011 | AL | 01.11.2017 | AT | 01.11.2017 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | ES | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | IT | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | NL | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | PT | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | RS | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | TR | 01.11.2017 | BG | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IE | 02.02.2018 | LU | 02.02.2018 | MT | 02.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 02.02.2011 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MK | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IE | 02.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.02.2018 | ||
MT | 02.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 02.02.2011 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IE | 02.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.02.2018 | ||
MT | 02.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
TR | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IE | 02.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.02.2018 | ||
MT | 02.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IE | 02.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.02.2018 | ||
MT | 02.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IE | 02.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IE | 02.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
LU | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
IT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
ES | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NL | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A] - C.C. HUANG ET AL., "Potential organ- or tumor-imaging agents. 18. radionated diamines and bisquaternaries", J. MED. CHEM., (1979), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 449 - 452, XP002588552 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00190a018 | by applicant | - ZALUTSKY MR; VAIDYANATHAN G, CURR PHARM DES., (2000), vol. 6, pages 1433 - 1455 | - ZALUTSKY MR; PRADEEP K. GARG; HENRY S. FRIEDMAN; DARELL D. BIGNER, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A, (1989), vol. 86, pages 7149 - 7153 | - WILBUR DS; CHYAN MK; HAMLIN DK; PERRY MA., BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (2009), vol. 20, pages 591 - 602 | - PRUSZYNSKI M; BILEWICZ A; ZALUTSKY MR, BIOCONJUGATE CHEM., (2007), vol. 19, pages 958 - 965 | - MACKLIS MR, INT. J. RADIATION ONCOLOGY BIOL. PHYS., (2006), vol. 66, pages S30 - S34 | - MEREDITH MR ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1995), vol. 36, pages 2229 - 2233 | - BOURGUIGNON MH; PAUWELS EKJ; LOC'H C; MAZIERE B, EUR. J. NUCL. MED., (1997), vol. 24, pages 331 - 344 | - PENTLOW KS ET AL., J. NUCL. MED., (1996), vol. 37, pages 1557 - 1562 | - J. MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, MCGRAW HILL BOOK COMPANY, (1977), pages 251 - 259 | - AMEY RL; MARTIN JC, J. ORG. CHEM., (1979), vol. 44, pages 1779 - 1784 |