EP2539546 - TURBINE SHROUD SUPPORT THERMAL SHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RULLI, Samuel, Ross 110 Thatcher Street Gloucester MA 01930 / US | 02 /
MENDES, Charles 28 Sandra Road Peabody MA 01960 / US | 03 /
MANTEIGA, John, Alan 242 Lacy St North Andover MA 01845 / US | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard, et al GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Williams, Andrew Richard, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/01] | Williams, Andrew Richard, et al Global Patent Operation-Europe GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11703533.7 | 26.01.2011 | WO2011US22504 | Priority number, date | US20100712639 | 25.02.2010 Original published format: US 712639 | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011106121 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2539546 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2539546 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/24, F01D25/14, F01D25/24 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
F01D25/145 (EP,US);
F01D11/24 (EP,US);
F01D25/246 (EP,US);
F05D2250/283 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HITZESCHILD FÜR EINEN TURBINENDECKBANDTRÄGER | [2015/02] | English: | TURBINE SHROUD SUPPORT THERMAL SHIELD | [2013/01] | French: | BOUCLIER THERMIQUE POUR SUPPORT D'ANNEAU DE TURBINE | [2015/02] |
Former [2013/01] | WÄRMEABSCHIRMUNG FÜR TURBINENMANTELTRÄGER | ||
Former [2013/01] | ÉCRAN THERMIQUE SUPPORT D'ENVELOPPE DE TURBINE | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 03.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.01.2011 | AL | 10.06.2015 | AT | 10.06.2015 | BE | 10.06.2015 | CY | 10.06.2015 | CZ | 10.06.2015 | DK | 10.06.2015 | EE | 10.06.2015 | ES | 10.06.2015 | FI | 10.06.2015 | HR | 10.06.2015 | IT | 10.06.2015 | LT | 10.06.2015 | LV | 10.06.2015 | MC | 10.06.2015 | MK | 10.06.2015 | NL | 10.06.2015 | PL | 10.06.2015 | RO | 10.06.2015 | RS | 10.06.2015 | SE | 10.06.2015 | SI | 10.06.2015 | SK | 10.06.2015 | SM | 10.06.2015 | TR | 10.06.2015 | BG | 10.09.2015 | NO | 10.09.2015 | GR | 11.09.2015 | IS | 10.10.2015 | PT | 12.10.2015 | IE | 26.01.2016 | LU | 26.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 26.01.2011 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MK | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
IE | 26.01.2016 | ||
LU | 26.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.01.2011 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MK | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
TR | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
IE | 26.01.2016 | ||
LU | 26.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.01.2011 | |
AT | 10.06.2015 | ||
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CY | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
HR | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MK | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
SM | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
IE | 26.01.2016 | ||
LU | 26.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
MT | 10.06.2015 | ||
NL | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SE | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
IE | 26.01.2016 | ||
LU | 26.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
IE | 26.01.2016 | ||
LU | 26.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
BE | 10.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 26.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 26.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
MC | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 26.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 26.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SI | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
IT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
DK | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 10.06.2015 | |
CZ | 10.06.2015 | ||
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 10.06.2015 | |
EE | 10.06.2015 | ||
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
PL | 10.06.2015 | ||
RO | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
SK | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
IS | 10.10.2015 | ||
PT | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 10.06.2015 | |
ES | 10.06.2015 | ||
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
BG | 10.09.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 10.06.2015 | |
FI | 10.06.2015 | ||
LT | 10.06.2015 | ||
LV | 10.06.2015 | ||
RS | 10.06.2015 | ||
NO | 10.09.2015 | ||
GR | 11.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5176495 (HONKOMP MARK S [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 4 - column 7, line 19; figures 3A,5,7 * [I] 2,7,10; | [XI]EP0522833 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 31; figures 4,5 * [I] 7,10; | [I]US5562408 (PROCTOR ROBERT [US], et al) [I] 1,7,10* column 5, line 40 - column 6, line 23; figures 1-3 * |