EP2534750 - METHOD FOR REDUCING THE STARTING CURRENT OF A POLYPHASE MACHINE OPERATED BY BLOCK COMMUTATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2012/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHRINGER, Paul Brandenkopfweg 9 70569 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
ROESNER, Julian Am Lerchenberg 38 74199 Untergruppenbach / DE | 03 /
MAGINI, Fabio Theodor-Heuss-Str. 18 71282 Hemmingen / DE | [2012/51] | Application number, filing date | 11703660.8 | 09.02.2011 | WO2011EP51892 | Priority number, date | DE20101001774 | 10.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010001774 | [2012/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011098485 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2534750 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2534750 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02P1/26, H02P1/46, H02P27/12, H02M7/5387, H02P6/08, H02P27/06 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
H02P1/26 (EP,US);
F02N11/04 (EP,US);
F02N15/08 (EP,US);
H02P1/46 (EP,US);
H02P27/06 (EP,US);
H02P27/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG DES ANLAUFSTROMES EINER MIT BLOCKKOMMUTIERUNG BETRIEBENEN MEHRPHASIGEN MASCHINE | [2012/51] | English: | METHOD FOR REDUCING THE STARTING CURRENT OF A POLYPHASE MACHINE OPERATED BY BLOCK COMMUTATION | [2012/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉDUIRE LE COURANT DE DÉMARRAGE D'UNE MACHINE POLYPHASÉE FONCTIONNANT PAR COMMUTATION EN BLOC | [2012/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 22.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.02.2011 | AL | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | HR | 25.12.2013 | IT | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | LV | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | MK | 25.12.2013 | MT | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | RS | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | SM | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | IE | 09.02.2014 | LU | 09.02.2014 | BE | 28.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | NO | 25.03.2014 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 09.02.2011 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MK | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 09.02.2011 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 09.02.2011 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 09.02.2014 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 09.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | |
NO | 25.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2003062860 (WU ZHIGAN [CN], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraphs [0008] , [0010] , [0014] , [0042]; figures 9-12 * [A] 7-12; | [YA]US2008116840 (WELCHKO BRIAN [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0037]; figures 1-10 *[A] 7-12; | [XAY]US2009174350 (KURODA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0054] , [0067] , [0084] , [0131]; figures 1-10,25,27 * * paragraphs [0153] , [0157] * [A] 7-12 [Y] 2-6 | by applicant | US6577097 | US7504790 |