EP2526383 - NAVIGATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin AW Co., Ltd. 10, Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi. Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASUDA, Hiroyoshi AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 02 /
TAKEUCHI, Kensuke AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 03 /
FUJIKAWA, Norihisa AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 04 /
IWATSUKI, Koichi AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 05 /
TANABE, Yoshihiro AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi, Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [2019/42] |
Former [2012/48] | 01 /
MASUDA Hiroyoshi c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKEUCHI Kensuke c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJIKAWA Norihisa c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | |||
04 /
IWATSUKI Koichi c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | |||
05 /
TANABE Yoshihiro c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/48] | Application number, filing date | 11703734.1 | 07.01.2011 | [2020/09] | WO2011JP50609 | Priority number, date | JP20100035320 | 19.02.2010 Original published format: JP 2010035320 | [2012/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011102163 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2526383 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2526383 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/32, G06F21/10, H04L29/06 | [2019/38] | CPC: |
G01C21/3859 (EP,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/48] | G01C21/32, G06F21/00, H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAVIGATIONSSYSTEM | [2012/48] | English: | NAVIGATION SYSTEM | [2012/48] | French: | SYSTÈME DE NAVIGATION | [2012/48] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 11.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 27.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2011 | AT | 26.02.2020 | CY | 26.02.2020 | CZ | 26.02.2020 | DK | 26.02.2020 | EE | 26.02.2020 | ES | 26.02.2020 | FI | 26.02.2020 | HR | 26.02.2020 | IT | 26.02.2020 | LT | 26.02.2020 | LV | 26.02.2020 | MC | 26.02.2020 | MK | 26.02.2020 | MT | 26.02.2020 | NL | 26.02.2020 | PL | 26.02.2020 | RO | 26.02.2020 | RS | 26.02.2020 | SE | 26.02.2020 | SI | 26.02.2020 | SK | 26.02.2020 | SM | 26.02.2020 | BG | 26.05.2020 | NO | 26.05.2020 | GR | 27.05.2020 | IS | 26.06.2020 | PT | 19.07.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 07.01.2011 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
MK | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 07.01.2011 | |
AT | 26.02.2020 | ||
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CY | 26.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
MC | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 26.02.2020 | |
CZ | 26.02.2020 | ||
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
IT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
PL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SI | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
EE | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 26.02.2020 | |
DK | 26.02.2020 | ||
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SK | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RO | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
SM | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
PT | 19.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 26.02.2020 | |
ES | 26.02.2020 | ||
FI | 26.02.2020 | ||
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LT | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
NL | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
IS | 26.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
BG | 26.05.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
GR | 27.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
HR | 26.02.2020 | ||
LV | 26.02.2020 | ||
RS | 26.02.2020 | ||
SE | 26.02.2020 | ||
NO | 26.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 26.02.2020 | |
NO | 26.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002087263 (WIENER CHRISTOPHER R [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0026] * * the whole document *; | [A]US2003084313 (TADA AKIHITO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0023] , [0039]; figure 6 * * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005210249 (LEE BYUNG-RAE [KR], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0003] - [0026] - [0072] , [0077] , [0079] - paragraphs [0085] , [0086] , [0147] - [0156]; figures 2-22 * * the whole document *; | [YA]WO2008088063 (AISIN AW CO [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * pages 3,5, paragraphs 4,2 - page 11, paragraph 5 * * the whole document * [A] 2-7; | [A]EP2098825 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0037] ** the whole document *; | [Y]US7613917 (CHOJNACKI ROBERT [US]) [Y] 1-7 * columns 2,9,15, paragraph 1 - columns 16,16,22; figures 1-13 * * the whole document *; | [Y]EP2113860 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] - [0004] - [0011] - [0012] - paragraphs [0043] - [0045] - [0056] - [0057] - [0064]; figures 1-12 * * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2005331579 | US7613917 |