|
20.04.2017 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.05.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.05.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.05.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
22.01.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2015 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
07.08.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
30.07.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2012 |
Priority search results copy provided by EPO |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
35 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
22.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
22.02.2011 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
28 |