EP2558192 - IMMERSION REACTOR FOR ADDING GASEOUS CHLORINE OR CHLORINE DIOXIDE IN WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/08] | IMMERSION REACTOR | ||
[2021/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2019/50] |
Former [2014/46] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2013/08] | For all designated states Infracor GmbH Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUVE, Johannes Feldweg 3 48249 Dülmen / DE | [2013/08] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2021/14] | Application number, filing date | 11704969.2 | 17.02.2011 | [2021/14] | WO2011EP52334 | Priority number, date | DE20101027840 | 16.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010027840 | [2013/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011128137 | Date: | 20.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2558192 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2558192 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/26, B01J4/00, C02F1/76, B01F3/04, B01F3/08, B01F5/04, C01B11/02 | [2021/03] | CPC: |
C02F1/763 (EP,US);
B01F23/23231 (EP);
B01F23/23763 (EP,US);
B01F23/454 (EP,US);
B01F25/31243 (EP,US);
B01J19/26 (EP,US);
B01J4/002 (EP,US);
C01B11/024 (EP,US);
C02F1/76 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/08] | B01J4/00, C01B11/02, C02F1/76, B01F5/04, B01J19/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TAUCHREAKTOR FÜR DIE ZUGABE VON CHLORGAS ODER CHLORDIOXID IN WASSER | [2021/03] | English: | IMMERSION REACTOR FOR ADDING GASEOUS CHLORINE OR CHLORINE DIOXIDE IN WATER | [2021/03] | French: | RÉACTEUR IMMERGÉ POUR L'AJOUT DE CHLORE GAZEUX OU DE DIOXYDE DE CHLORE DANS L'EAU | [2021/03] |
Former [2013/08] | TAUCHREAKTOR | ||
Former [2013/08] | IMMERSION REACTOR | ||
Former [2013/08] | RÉACTEUR IMMERGÉ | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/08] | 21.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 16.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.04.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 12.04.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.02.2011 | AL | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | CZ | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | FI | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | MT | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | TR | 07.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
TR | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.02.2011 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0024851 (RIO LINDA CHEM CO INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * page 4, line 27 - page 6, line 32 * * figure 4 *; | [I]WO0214216 (SABRE OXIDATION TECHNOLOGIES I [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * pages 6-12 * * figure 1 *; | [ID]WO03000586 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [ID] 1-12 * page 5, line 22 - page 7, line 3 * * figures 1,2, 3a,3b *; | [I]US2005244328 (SCHMITZ WILFRIED J [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0066] , [0075] - [0085] - [0 93] - [0095] - [0100] - [0105] * * figures 1-3,6,7 *; | [X]JP2008094662 (TAKIMOTO GIKEN KOGYO KK, et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] - [0029] * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2008219087 (FLYNN HARRY E [US], et al) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [XD]DE102008042424 (INFRACOR GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0043] , [0046] , [0048] , [0054] - [0061] - [0064] * * figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE102008049734 (WEIDNER WASSERTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A] - Dripping Wet Water ET AL, "Using catalytic chlorine dioxide to eradicate Legionella in a cooling tower", Technical brochure, Texas (USA), (20090101), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.clo2ix.com/hq_pdfs/CLO2IX Case Study - Eradicate Legionella in a Cooling Tower.pdf, (20111010), XP055009057 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0119686 | JP2002220207 | WO03000586 | DE202004005755U | WO2004078648 | WO2009077309 | WO2009077213 | DE102008049734 |