Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013002981 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161505348 | 07.07.2011 | US71672410 | 03.03.2010 | US201161535648 | 16.09.2011 | US201161493702 | 06.06.2011 | US201161506819 | 12.07.2011 | US30400310 | 12.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009151453 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US66754 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015201924 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71672410 | 03.03.2010 | US201414451351 | 04.08.2014 | US30400310 | 12.02.2010 | WO2008US66754 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015164500 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161505348 | 07.07.2011 | US71672410 | 03.03.2010 | US201161535648 | 16.09.2011 | US201161493702 | 06.06.2011 | US201161506819 | 12.07.2011 | WO2012US41063 | 06.06.2012 | US30400310 | 12.02.2010 | US201214124700 | 06.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013144310 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161505348 | 07.07.2011 | US71672410 | 03.03.2010 | US201161535648 | 16.09.2011 | US201161493702 | 06.06.2011 | US201161506819 | 12.07.2011 | US30400310 | 12.02.2010 | US201213490018 | 06.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8795333 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2014 | B2 | US2013060190 | 07.03.2013 | A9 | US2011202002 | 18.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71672410 | 03.03.2010 | US30400310 | 12.02.2010 | WO2008US66754 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011160749 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US66754 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014523763 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161505348 | 07.07.2011 | US201161535648 | 16.09.2011 | US201161493702 | 06.06.2011 | US201161506819 | 12.07.2011 | WO2012US41063 | 06.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013519447 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US71672410 | 03.03.2010 | WO2011US24476 | 11.02.2011 | US30400310 | 12.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5625142B | Global Dossier | 19.11.2014 | B2 | JP2011522667 | 04.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US66754 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2717785 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161505348 | 07.07.2011 | US201161535648 | 16.09.2011 | US201161493702 | 06.06.2011 | US201161506819 | 12.07.2011 | WO2012US41063 | 06.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2299935 | Global Dossier | 27.02.2013 | A4 | EP2299935 | 30.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US66754 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104023649 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161505348 | 07.07.2011 | US201161535648 | 16.09.2011 | US201161493702 | 06.06.2011 | US201161506819 | 12.07.2011 | WO2012US41063 | 06.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103118604 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US71672410 | 03.03.2010 | WO2011US24476 | 11.02.2011 | US30400310 | 12.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2012275965 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161505348 | 07.07.2011 | US201161535648 | 16.09.2011 | US201161493702 | 06.06.2011 | US201161506819 | 12.07.2011 | WO2012US41063 | 06.06.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008357655 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US66754 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2533701 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US71672410 | 03.03.2010 | WO2011US24476 | 11.02.2011 | US30400310 | 12.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2727591 | 10.12.2013 | C | CA2727591 | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US66754 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2789577 | 18.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71672410 | 03.03.2010 | WO2011US24476 | 11.02.2011 | US30400310 | 12.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2838509 | 03.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161505348 | 07.07.2011 | US201161535648 | 16.09.2011 | US201161493702 | 06.06.2011 | US201161506819 | 12.07.2011 | WO2012US41063 | 06.06.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011100515 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2012 | A3 | WO2011100515 | 18.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US71672410 | 03.03.2010 | US30400310 | 12.02.2010 |