|
07.07.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.05.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
03.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2018 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
03.07.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.11.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2013 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-reply to Written Opinion) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.07.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2012 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.12.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
15.09.2011 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |