EP2531700 - TURBINE ENGINE AIR BLOWER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snecma 2 Bld du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | [2012/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELAPIERRE, Michaël c/o Snecma PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau F-77550 Moissy Cramayel Cedex / FR | 02 /
REGHEZZA, Patrick, Jean-Louis c/o Snecma PI (AJI) Rond-Point René Ravaud - Réau F-77550 Moissy Cramayel Cedex / FR | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Ramey, Daniel, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber FR-75009 Paris / FR | [2012/50] | Application number, filing date | 11705644.0 | 21.01.2011 | WO2011FR50116 | Priority number, date | FR20100000456 | 04.02.2010 Original published format: FR 1000456 | [2012/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011095722 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2531700 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2531700 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/30, F04D29/32 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
F01D5/3007 (EP,US);
F01D5/3092 (EP,US);
F04D29/322 (EP,US);
F05C2201/0466 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEBLÄSE FÜR EINEN TURBINENMOTOR | [2012/50] | English: | TURBINE ENGINE AIR BLOWER | [2012/50] | French: | SOUFFLANTE DE TURBOMACHINE | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 11.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2011 | AL | 25.12.2013 | AT | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | HR | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | LV | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | MK | 25.12.2013 | MT | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | RS | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | SM | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | IE | 21.01.2014 | LU | 21.01.2014 | BE | 31.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | NO | 25.03.2014 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.01.2011 | |
AT | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MK | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.01.2014 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 21.01.2011 | |
AT | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.01.2014 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.01.2011 | |
AT | 25.12.2013 | ||
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.01.2014 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.01.2014 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.01.2014 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.01.2014 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.01.2014 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.01.2014 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 21.01.2014 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 21.01.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | |
NO | 25.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1873401 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 7 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028] * * figure - * [I] 8; | [XI]EP1970538 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 7 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026]; figure - * [I] 8; | [A]FR2929660 (SNECMA SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document * |