EP2531986 - POWER SAVING FEATURES IN A COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. L'Horizon Gunsite Road Brittons Hill St. Michael 14027 / BB | [2016/22] |
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states Marvell World Trade Ltd. L'Horizon, Gunsite Road Brittons Hills BB 14027 Saint Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAMURTHY, Harish 970 Corte Madera Ct., 102 Sunnyvale CA 94085 / US | 02 /
GOEL, Sandesh D-503 Imperial Residence Kalyani Nagar Pune 41106 / IN | 03 /
BANERJEA, Raja 970 Corte Madera Ct. Apt. 203 Sunnyvale CA 94085 / US | 04 /
SHUKLA, Ashish, Kumar M-40, Flat No. 1811 Maharastra Housing Board Pune 411006 / IN | [2012/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/22] |
Former [2012/50] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11705731.5 | 28.01.2011 | [2016/22] | WO2011US23066 | Priority number, date | US20100300737P | 02.02.2010 Original published format: US 300737 P | [2012/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011097141 | Date: | 11.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2531986 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2531986 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G08C17/00 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
H04W28/065 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/04 (EP,KR,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEEINSPARUNGSFUNKTIONEN BEI EINER KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2012/50] | English: | POWER SAVING FEATURES IN A COMMUNICATION DEVICE | [2012/50] | French: | FONCTIONS D'ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE DANS UN DISPOSITIF DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION | [2012/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/50] | 14.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2011 | AL | 01.06.2016 | AT | 01.06.2016 | BE | 01.06.2016 | BG | 01.06.2016 | CY | 01.06.2016 | CZ | 01.06.2016 | DK | 01.06.2016 | EE | 01.06.2016 | ES | 01.06.2016 | FI | 01.06.2016 | HR | 01.06.2016 | IT | 01.06.2016 | LT | 01.06.2016 | LV | 01.06.2016 | MC | 01.06.2016 | MK | 01.06.2016 | NL | 01.06.2016 | PL | 01.06.2016 | RO | 01.06.2016 | RS | 01.06.2016 | SE | 01.06.2016 | SI | 01.06.2016 | SK | 01.06.2016 | SM | 01.06.2016 | TR | 01.06.2016 | NO | 01.09.2016 | GR | 02.09.2016 | IS | 01.10.2016 | PT | 03.10.2016 | IE | 28.01.2017 | LU | 28.01.2017 | MT | 28.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
AL | 01.06.2016 | ||
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
MK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
MT | 28.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
AL | 01.06.2016 | ||
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CY | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
MT | 28.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
AL | 01.06.2016 | ||
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
BG | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
MT | 28.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.01.2011 | |
AL | 01.06.2016 | ||
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
MT | 28.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 01.06.2016 | |
AT | 01.06.2016 | ||
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
MT | 28.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
MT | 28.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
IE | 28.01.2017 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
MC | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
DK | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SI | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 01.06.2016 | |
BE | 01.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
SM | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
PT | 03.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 01.06.2016 | |
CZ | 01.06.2016 | ||
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
PL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
SK | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
IS | 01.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 01.06.2016 | |
EE | 01.06.2016 | ||
ES | 01.06.2016 | ||
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
IT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RO | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
NL | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
SE | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
GR | 02.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 01.06.2016 | |
FI | 01.06.2016 | ||
HR | 01.06.2016 | ||
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
LV | 01.06.2016 | ||
RS | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 01.06.2016 | |
LT | 01.06.2016 | ||
NO | 01.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 01.06.2016 | |
NO | 01.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2005112355 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,15,20,35 * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 9 * * page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 14; figure 3 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 11 * * page 11, line 3 - page 12, line 21; figures 9,10 * [I] 2-14,16-19,21-34,36-39; | [XI]US2006078001 (CHANDRA ARTY [US], et al) [X] 1,15,20,35 * paragraphs [0002] , [0028] , [0029] , [0036] , [0038] , [0052] , [0053] * [I] 2-14,16-19,21-34,36-39; | [A]US2006187964 (LI QINGHUA [US], et al) [A] 1-39* figure 2 * | Examination | US2007104162 | - XAVIER PEREZ-COSTA ET AL, "AU-APSD: Adaptive IEEE 802.11e Unscheduled Automatic Power Save Delivery", COMMUNICATIONS, 2006. ICC '06. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (20060601), ISBN 978-1-4244-0354-7, pages 2020 - 2027, XP031025361 | by applicant | US19370613007 |