EP2561039 - METHOD FOR COLLECTING RESIDUAL COKE FROM NON-RECOVERY AND HEAT-RECOVERY COKE OVENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Industrial Solutions AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2015/08] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Uhde GmbH Friedrich-Uhde-Strasse 15 44141 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BADURA, Sven In Boymannsheide 17 46240 Bottrop / DE | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Fabry, Bernd IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH Schlossstrasse 523-525 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 11705809.9 | 10.02.2011 | WO2011EP00634 | Priority number, date | DE20101010988 | 10.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010010988 | [2013/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011110269 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2561039 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C10B33/00, C10B45/00, C10B33/10 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
C10B33/003 (EP,US);
C10B33/00 (KR);
C10B33/10 (KR,US);
C10B33/14 (US);
C10B45/00 (KR);
C10B45/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM AUFFANGEN VON SCHLABBERKOKS AUS NON- UND HEAT-RECOVERY-KOKSÖFEN | [2013/09] | English: | METHOD FOR COLLECTING RESIDUAL COKE FROM NON-RECOVERY AND HEAT-RECOVERY COKE OVENS | [2013/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COLLECTE DE COKE RÉSIDUEL À PARTIR DE FOURS À COKE SANS ET AVEC RÉCUPÉRATION DE CHALEUR | [2013/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 23.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 28.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees RO, IS, IE, EE, AT, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, HU, HR, GR, GB, FI, ES, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AL, FR | 02.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 02.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 02.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 02.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS5778483 (SUMIKIN KAKO KK) [Y] 1-4 * figures 1,2 * * claim - * * abstract *; | [YD]WO2007022816 (SCHALKER EISENHUETTE MASCHF [DE], et al) [YD] 1-4 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0025] * | by applicant | DE102007045426 | WO2007022816 |