|
16.02.2016 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn ( translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2012 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
22.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
18 |
|
08.05.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
08.05.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
08.05.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.05.2012 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.05.2012 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.04.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
30.04.2012 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.04.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
11.04.2012 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
9 |
|
22.02.2012 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
13.09.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
31.08.2011 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.08.2011 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.2011 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.08.2011 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
19.08.2011 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.08.2011 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.04.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
6 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
43 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
12 |
|
25.02.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |