Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011097271 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113012308 | 24.01.2011 | US30191910 | 05.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8873479 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2014 | B2 | US2011194437 | 11.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113012417 | 24.01.2011 | US30536410 | 17.02.2010 | US30191910 | 05.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8848553 | Global Dossier | 30.09.2014 | B2 | US2011194436 | 11.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113012308 | 24.01.2011 | US30191910 | 05.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101417724B | Global Dossier | 13.08.2014 | B1 | KR20140032514 | 14.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113012417 | 24.01.2011 | US30536410 | 17.02.2010 | WO2011US24232 | 09.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101413807B | Global Dossier | 30.06.2014 | B1 | KR20120127486 | 21.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113012308 | 24.01.2011 | WO2011US23431 | 02.02.2011 | US30191910 | 05.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101413772B | Global Dossier | 30.06.2014 | B1 | KR20120127503 | 21.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113012417 | 24.01.2011 | US30536410 | 17.02.2010 | WO2011US24232 | 09.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5650764B | Global Dossier | 07.01.2015 | B2 | JP2013520085 | 30.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113012417 | 24.01.2011 | US30536410 | 17.02.2010 | WO2011US24232 | 09.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5581402B | Global Dossier | 27.08.2014 | B2 | JP2013519302 | 23.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113012308 | 24.01.2011 | WO2011US23431 | 02.02.2011 | US30191910 | 05.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2532203 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2015 | B1 | EP2532203 | 12.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113012308 | 24.01.2011 | WO2011US23431 | 02.02.2011 | US30191910 | 05.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104735823B | Global Dossier | 14.08.2018 | B | CN104735823 | 24.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113012308 | 24.01.2011 | CN201180016231 | 02.02.2011 | US30191910 | 05.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102845114B | Global Dossier | 29.07.2015 | B | CN102845114 | 26.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113012308 | 24.01.2011 | WO2011US23431 | 02.02.2011 | US30191910 | 05.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102763483B | Global Dossier | 30.09.2015 | B | CN102763483 | 31.10.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113012417 | 24.01.2011 | US30536410 | 17.02.2010 | WO2011US24232 | 09.02.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2537388 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113012417 | 24.01.2011 | US30536410 | 17.02.2010 | WO2011US24232 | 09.02.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011103008 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113012417 | 24.01.2011 | US30536410 | 17.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5784162B | Global Dossier | 24.09.2015 | B2 | JP2014140195 | 31.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113012417 | 24.01.2011 | US30536410 | 17.02.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104394517 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201113012417 | 24.01.2011 | US30536410 | 17.02.2010 |