EP2536494 - INTUITIVE GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE FOR CARRYING OUT CHEMICAL REACTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Medical Solutions USA, Inc. 51, Valley Stream Parkway Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2012/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELIZAROV, Arkadij, M. 19834 Haynes St. Woodland Hills, California 91367 / US | 02 /
BALL, Carroll, Edward 25292 Misty Ridge Mission Viejo California 92692 / US | 03 /
GRAW, Ansgar 1879 N. Leavitt Street Chicago, Illinois 60647 / US | 04 /
KOLB, Hartmuth, C. 6413 Pacific Avenue Playa Del Rey, California 90293 / US | 05 /
SHAH, Uttam, D. 20455 Anza Ave 21 Torrance, California 90503 / US | [2012/52] | Representative(s) | Brocklehurst, Adam Jeffrey Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | Brocklehurst, Adam Jeffrey Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11706095.4 | 15.02.2011 | WO2011US24863 | Priority number, date | US20100304610P | 15.02.2010 Original published format: US 304610 P | [2012/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011100737 | Date: | 18.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2536494 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00, B01L3/00, G06F19/00 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
B01J19/0093 (EP,US);
G05B15/02 (EP,US);
G16C20/10 (EP,US);
G16C20/80 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0095 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00952 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00959 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00961 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00975 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Title | German: | INTUITIVE GRAPHISCHE BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG CHEMISCHER REAKTIONEN | [2012/52] | English: | INTUITIVE GRAPHICAL USER INTERFACE FOR CARRYING OUT CHEMICAL REACTIONS | [2012/52] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR GRAPHIQUE INTUITIVE DESTINÉE À RÉALISER DES RÉACTIONS CHIMIQUES | [2012/52] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 14.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/40] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2008091694 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS [US], et al) [X] 1-40 * abstract * * page 5, line 1 - line 3 * * page 10, line 26 - line 29 * * page 12, line 9 - line 31 * * page 14, line 1 - line 29 * * page 17, line 5 - page 18, line 5 * * page 22, line 5 - page 24, line 13 * * page 25, line 22 - page 27, line 24; figure -; claim - *; | [XD]WO2008128201 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS [US], et al) [XD] 1-40 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0116] * * paragraph [0123] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0131] - paragraph [0136]; figure -; claim - *; | [XI]DE19917398 (SCHWESINGER NORBERT [DE], et al) [X] 37-40 * abstract * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 68 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 14 * * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 44; figures 1, 2; claim - * [I] 1-36; | [XI]US6489168 (WANG PEI [US], et al) [X] 37-40 * abstract * * column 1, line 58 - column 3, line 9 * * column 3, line 48 - column 6, line 54 * * column 12, line 53 - column 23, line 34; figure -; table - * [I] 1-36; | [XI]WO0067086 (SYMYX TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 37-40 * abstract * * page 7, line 30 - page 9, line 20 * * page 25, line 26 - page 26, line 14 * * page 29, line 8 - page 30, line 10; figure -; table 1 * [I] 1-36; | [XI]WO2009092392 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 37-40 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 7; figure - * [I] 1-36; | [XP]WO2011006032 (SIEMENS MEDICAL SOLUTIONS [US], et al) [XP] 1-40 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0144] * * paragraph [0260] - paragraph [0276] * * paragraph [0279] - paragraph [0287] * * paragraph [0291] * * paragraph [0307]; figure -; claim -; table - * | by applicant | WO2008US60267 |