12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
17.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
09.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
28.11.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
10.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
22.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
15.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
20.12.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] |
17.12.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.12.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.09.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] |
12.08.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.08.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
02.08.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
02.08.2013 |
Change - inventor |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
02.08.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] |
12.07.2013 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
12.07.2013 |
Change - French title |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
03.05.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.12.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] |
07.12.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] |
04.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|