Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8741561 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2014 | B2 | US2013065781 | 14.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113580832 | 24.02.2011 | WO2011US26086 | 24.02.2011 | US30917910 | 01.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011223937B | Global Dossier | 23.01.2014 | B8 | AU2011223937B | 12.12.2013 | B2 | AU2011223937 | 06.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US26086 | 24.02.2011 | US30917910 | 01.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2542691 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2014 | B1 | EP2542691 | 09.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US26086 | 24.02.2011 | US30917910 | 01.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2791662 | 09.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011US26086 | 24.02.2011 | US30917910 | 01.03.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011109224 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2011 | A8 | WO2011109224 | 09.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US30917910 | 01.03.2010 |