EP2544972 - METHOD FOR STORING AND ORDER-PICKING ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dynamic System Engineering B.V. Havenstraat 90 7005 AG Doetinchem / NL | [2013/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIEFTINK, Willem Johan Welinkdwarsweg 12 NL-7091 XG Dinxperlo / NL | 02 /
OTTEN, Sjoerd Jerk De Brouwery 10 NL-6999 CN Hummelo / NL | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Christophersen, Ruth, et al Bungartz Christophersen Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Homberger Straße 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Christophersen, Ruth Christophersen & Partner Patentanwälte Homberger Strasse 5 40474 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 11707824.6 | 03.03.2011 | WO2011EP53218 | Priority number, date | DE20101015887 | 09.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010015887 | [2013/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011110474 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2544972 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2544972 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04, B65G1/137, B65G57/00, B65G59/00 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
B65G1/1378 (EP);
B65G1/0435 (EP);
B65G1/0485 (EP);
B65G57/005 (EP);
B65G59/005 (EP);
B65G2201/0261 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN DER WARENBEVORRATUNG UND -KOMMISSIONIERUNG | [2013/03] | English: | METHOD FOR STORING AND ORDER-PICKING ARTICLES | [2013/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE ET DE PRÉPARATION DE COMMANDES D'ARTICLES | [2013/03] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 07.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2011 | AL | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | HR | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MK | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | RS | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | SM | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | NO | 07.08.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 03.03.2011 | |
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MK | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
TR | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 03.03.2011 | |
BG | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
SM | 07.05.2014 | ||
TR | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RS | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102006025618 (SSI SCHAEFER NOELL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,13 * figures 2-4; claim 1 *; | [AD]DE20306390U (WITRON LOGISTIK & INF GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102006025618 | DE20306390U | EP1035045 |