|
08.02.2023 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2023 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2023 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2023 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2023 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.01.2023 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2022 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2022 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.09.2022 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.09.2022 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.2022 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.08.2022 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
11 |
|
19.08.2022 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2022 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.2021 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 |
Appeal |
6 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 03 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 04 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 05 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 06 |
Appeal |
5 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.2021 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
25.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.02.2021 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
16.12.2020 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Appeal |
44 |
|
15.12.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2020 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Appeal |
34 |
|
12.10.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
09.10.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2020 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.08.2020 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2020 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
20.03.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2019 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2019 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2019 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.01.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2018 |
Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2018 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.06.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2016 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2016 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2016 |
Communication of expected date of establishment of search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2013 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2013 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
31.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.07.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2012 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2012 |
International publication of the international search report |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
312 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
220 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Published international application - A2 |
Appeal |
229 |
|
21.07.2011 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
229 |