EP2539872 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ELECTRONICALLY PROVIDING AN ACCESS AUTHORIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Easy Axess GmbH I.G. Amalienstrasse 71 80799 München / DE | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Timotheus Hornweg 18 A-6370 Kitzbühel / AT | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11708216.4 | 22.02.2011 | WO2011EP52590 | Priority number, date | AT20100000264 | 22.02.2010 Original published format: AT 2642010 | DE20101008878 | 22.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010008878 | [2013/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011101486 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2539872 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/00, G07C9/00 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
G07B15/00 (EP,US);
G07C9/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ELEKTRONISCHEN BEREITSTELLEN EINER ZUTRITTSBERECHTIGUNG | [2013/01] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR ELECTRONICALLY PROVIDING AN ACCESS AUTHORIZATION | [2013/01] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR UNE HABILITATION D'ACCÈS PAR VOIE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 11.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 01.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]NL9301902 (NEDERLAND PTT) [X] 1,7,12,14-16 * figure 1 * * page 2, line 13 - page 3, line 9 * * page 3, line 19 - page 3, line 35 *; | [A]DE10032409 (GSI GES FUER SYSTEMTECHNIK UND [DE]) [A] 1-16 * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 13 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 10 ** column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 8 *; | [XYI]WO0115027 (WEBPRINT KY [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,12,14,16 * figure 1 * * page 6, line 24 - page 9, line 10 * [Y] 9-11 [I] 3; | [XI]WO0184504 (SIA CYRIL H [US]) [X] 1,4,7,12-16 * figures 1-6 * * page 1, line 5 - line 24 * * page 2, line 28 - line 31 * * page 6, line 25 - line 34 * * page 7, line 12 - line 15 * * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 7 * * page 8, line 15 - line 24 * * page 9, line 4 - line 19 * * page 10, line 5 - page 11, line 7 * [I] 5; | [A]JP2002109343 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [X]DE10130061 (SKIDATA AG [AT]) [X] 1,2,6,12,14,16 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0024] *; | [X]EP1345180 (SWISSCOM MOBILE AG [CH]) [X] 14 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0038] *; | [Y]US2007276944 (SAMOVAR KERRY [US], et al) [Y] 9,11 * figures 1-7 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0048] *; | [Y]EP2081140 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * |