EP2686859 - GAS-INSULATED HIGH-VOLTAGE CIRCUIT BREAKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2014/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEHR, Timo Dorfstrasse 116 CH-5244 Birrhard / CH | 02 /
HUNGER, Olaf Meisenweg 16 CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | 03 /
NUFER, Jürg Zürichstrasse 39 CH-8600 Dübendorf / CH | 04 /
OHLSSON, Daniel Zentralstrasse 130 CH-5430 Wettingen / CH | 05 /
MAHDIZADEH, Navid St. Christopherstrasse 8 CH-5400 Baden / CH | 06 /
MANTILLA, Javier Dynamostrasse 16 CH-5400 Baden / CH | 07 /
GROB, Stephan Meierhofstrasse 8 CH-5400 Baden / CH | 08 /
BUERGLER, Mathias-Dominic Zelgweg 9b CH-5405 Baden-Dättwil / CH | 09 /
GARIBOLDI, Nicola Kirchweg 44C CH-5415 Nussbaumen / CH | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2014/04] | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 11708497.0 | 17.03.2011 | WO2011EP54068 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012123032 | Date: | 20.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2686859 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2686859 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/90, H01H33/91 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
H01H33/901 (EP,US);
H01H33/91 (EP,KR,US);
H01H33/86 (US);
H01H33/90 (KR);
H01H2033/906 (EP,US);
H01H2033/908 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASISOLIERTER HOCHSPANNUNGS-LEISTUNGSSCHALTER | [2014/04] | English: | GAS-INSULATED HIGH-VOLTAGE CIRCUIT BREAKER | [2014/04] | French: | DISJONCTEUR HAUTE TENSION À ISOLATION DANS LE GAZ | [2014/04] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 17.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2011 | AL | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | ES | 26.11.2014 | FI | 26.11.2014 | HR | 26.11.2014 | IT | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | MK | 26.11.2014 | MT | 26.11.2014 | NL | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | RS | 26.11.2014 | SE | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | SM | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | NO | 26.02.2015 | GR | 27.02.2015 | GB | 17.03.2015 | IE | 17.03.2015 | LU | 17.03.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 17.03.2011 | |
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MK | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
GB | 17.03.2015 | ||
IE | 17.03.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 17.03.2011 | |
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
GB | 17.03.2015 | ||
IE | 17.03.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
GB | 17.03.2015 | ||
IE | 17.03.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
GB | 17.03.2015 | ||
IE | 17.03.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
GB | 17.03.2015 | ||
IE | 17.03.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
LU | 17.03.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 26.11.2014 | |
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0296363 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [AD]WO9320573 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]WO9912177 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP1079404 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]); | [AD]EP1939910 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]); | [AD]EP2270828 (AREVA T & D SAS [FR]); | [T]EP2299464 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AG [CH]) | by applicant | DE4211159 | US5589673 | EP1939910 | EP2270828 | EP2299464 |