EP2588057 - TRAINING GARMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baranowski, Zbigniew Ul. Zbyszka z Bogdanca 2 80-419 Gdansk / PL | [2013/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Czabajski, Jacek TRASET Rzecznicy Patentowi Sp.p Ul. Piecewska 27 80-288 Gdansk / PL | [2013/19] | Application number, filing date | 11708590.2 | 14.02.2011 | WO2011PL00015 | Priority number, date | PL20100392900 | 09.11.2010 Original published format: PL 39290010 | PL20100391707 | 02.07.2010 Original published format: PL 39170710 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012002828 | Date: | 05.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2588057 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61H36/00, A41D13/00 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
A61H36/00 (EP);
A61H2201/10 (EP);
A61H2201/1621 (EP);
A61H2201/163 (EP);
A61H2201/1642 (EP);
A61H2201/165 (EP);
A61H2201/50 (EP);
A61H2203/0406 (EP);
A61H2205/08 (EP);
A61H2205/083 (EP);
A61H2205/086 (EP);
A61H2205/108 (EP);
A61H2207/00 (EP);
A61N2005/0659 (EP);
A63B22/0235 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Title | German: | TRAININGSKLEIDUNGSSTÜCK | [2013/19] | English: | TRAINING GARMENT | [2013/19] | French: | VÊTEMENT D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2013/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/19] | 01.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2014/08] | 12.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO03030808 (EGGER NORBERT [AT]) [X] 1-4,8,9 * page 2, paragraph 5 - page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 5 - page 5, paragraph 3; figure - * [I] 5-7,10,11; | [XYI]WO0152787 (EGGER NORBERT [AT]) [X] 1,4,8 * page 2, paragraph 1 - page 4, paragraph 1; figure - * [Y] 2,3 [I] 5-7,9-11; | [Y]US2008243041 (BRENNER PATRICIA [US], et al) [Y] 2,3 * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0037]; figure - *; | [A]US4241721 (HOLLY GORDON L [US]) [A] 5-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0107518 | CN2514826Y | WO03030808 | PL196885B | PL64906Y |