EP2552385 - PREPARATIONS COMPRISING DIHYDROXYACETONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | For all designated states Sachtleben Chemie GmbH Dr.-Rudolf-Sachtleben-Strasse 4 47198 Duisburg / DE | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECK, Joern Holzstrasse 11 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | 02 /
GRAF, Ruediger Birkenweg 2a 64853 Otzberg / DE | 03 /
PFLUECKER, Frank Hartmuth-Pfeil-Weg 9 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
JOHN, Stephan Grenzstrasse 61 47198 Duisburg / DE | 05 /
HIRTHE, Bernd Am Kuhlenhof 18 47918 Toenisvorst / DE | [2013/06] | Application number, filing date | 11708708.0 | 28.02.2011 | [2017/30] | WO2011EP00965 | Priority number, date | EP20100003250 | 26.03.2010 Original published format: EP 10003250 | [2013/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011116868 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2552385 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2552385 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/25, A61K8/26, A61K8/29, A61K8/35, A61K8/55, A61Q19/04 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
A61K8/35 (EP);
A61K8/06 (EP);
A61K8/25 (EP);
A61K8/26 (EP);
A61K8/29 (EP);
A61K8/55 (EP);
A61Q19/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNGEN ENTHALTEND DIHYDROXYACETON | [2013/06] | English: | PREPARATIONS COMPRISING DIHYDROXYACETONE | [2013/06] | French: | PRÉPARATIONS CONTENANT DE LA DIHYDROXYACÉTONE | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 26.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.02.2011 | AL | 26.07.2017 | CY | 26.07.2017 | CZ | 26.07.2017 | DK | 26.07.2017 | EE | 26.07.2017 | FI | 26.07.2017 | HR | 26.07.2017 | LT | 26.07.2017 | LV | 26.07.2017 | MC | 26.07.2017 | MK | 26.07.2017 | MT | 26.07.2017 | NL | 26.07.2017 | PT | 26.07.2017 | RO | 26.07.2017 | RS | 26.07.2017 | SE | 26.07.2017 | SI | 26.07.2017 | SK | 26.07.2017 | SM | 26.07.2017 | TR | 26.07.2017 | BG | 26.10.2017 | NO | 26.10.2017 | GR | 27.10.2017 | IS | 26.11.2017 | AT | 28.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | IE | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | LU | 28.02.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 28.02.2011 | |
CY | 26.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MK | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 28.02.2011 | |
CZ | 26.07.2017 | ||
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
PT | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
TR | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
AT | 28.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
IE | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
LU | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MC | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
MT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SI | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
SM | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
EE | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RO | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
SK | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 26.07.2017 | |
DK | 26.07.2017 | ||
FI | 26.07.2017 | ||
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
LV | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
HR | 26.07.2017 | ||
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
RS | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
BG | 26.10.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
GR | 27.10.2017 | ||
IS | 26.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
SE | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 26.07.2017 | |
LT | 26.07.2017 | ||
NL | 26.07.2017 | ||
NO | 26.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 26.07.2017 | |
NO | 26.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO9217159 (RICHARDSON VICKS INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9-11,15 * page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 2; example -; claim - * [Y] 1-15; | [X]EP0576188 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 2,6-8 * example 1 *; | [YD]DE102007013368 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0052] - [0054] - [0079] , [0081] , [0100] *; | [A]WO2005025531 (COTY BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - * | [X] - "Tanning Bed in a Tube", GNPD, Mintel, (200807), Database accession no. 943224, XP002670751 [X] 1-3,5,6,11,12 * "Ingredients" * | [X] - "Face Visage Self Tan for Face", GNPD, Mintel, (200709), Database accession no. 763035, XP002670752 [X] 1-3,5,6,11,12 * "Ingredients" * |