EP2544805 - SOLID CHEMICAL DISSOLVER AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/03] | SOLID CHEMICAL DISSOLVER AND METHODS | ||
[2015/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solenis Technologies Cayman, L.P. Mühlentalstrasse 38 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states Solenis Technologies Cayman, L.P. Rheinweg 11 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Ashland Licensing And Intellectual Property LLC A Delaware Limited Liability Company 5200 Blazer Parkway Dublin, OH 43017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYAS, Matthew, S. 7190 Nagelwoods Drive Cincinnati OH 45255 / US | 02 /
GRABOW, George, S. 8229 Tricia Price Drive Powell OH 43065 / US | 03 /
HOLT, Donald, A. 8 Nijinsky Court Whitby ON L1N7L7 / CA | 04 /
HAAS, Richard, E. 4 Promont Court Milford OH 45150 / US | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/39] | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2013/03] | Bülle, Jan, et al Kutzenberger & Wolff Patentanwaltssozietät Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11708956.5 | 08.03.2011 | [2015/39] | WO2011US27489 | Priority number, date | US201113031724 | 22.02.2011 Original published format: US201113031724 | US20100339702P | 08.03.2010 Original published format: US 339702 P | [2013/13] |
Former [2013/03] | US20110031724 | 22.02.2011 | |
US20100339702P | 08.03.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011112542 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2544805 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2544805 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01F1/00 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
B01F21/221 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (KR);
B01F21/00 (KR);
C02F1/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSUNGSMITTEL FÜR CHEMISCHE FESTKÖRPER UND VERFAHREN | [2015/18] | English: | SOLID CHEMICAL DISSOLVER AND METHODS | [2015/39] | French: | DISSOLVEUR DE PRODUIT CHIMIQUE SOLIDE ET PROCÉDÉ | [2015/18] |
Former [2013/03] | FESTES CHEMISCHES LÖSEMITTEL UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2013/03] | SOLID CHEMICAL DISSOLVER AND METHODS | ||
Former [2013/03] | DISSOLVEUR DE PRODUIT CHIMIQUE SOLIDE ET MÉTHODES | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 22.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.03.2015 | 26.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2011 | AL | 23.09.2015 | BG | 23.09.2015 | CY | 23.09.2015 | CZ | 23.09.2015 | DK | 23.09.2015 | EE | 23.09.2015 | HR | 23.09.2015 | LT | 23.09.2015 | LV | 23.09.2015 | MC | 23.09.2015 | MK | 23.09.2015 | RO | 23.09.2015 | RS | 23.09.2015 | SI | 23.09.2015 | SK | 23.09.2015 | SM | 23.09.2015 | GR | 24.12.2015 | IS | 23.01.2016 | LU | 08.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 08.03.2011 | |
BG | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.03.2011 | |
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MT | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
LU | 08.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/10] | HR | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 23.09.2015 | |
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 23.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2005244315 (GREAVES MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-13,17 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0054] - [0064] * [I] 3 | by applicant | US2371720 | US3383178 | US3595438 | US4858449 | US4964185 | US5137694 | US6441073 | US6418958 | US6820661 | US2007269894 | US2010025338 |