EP2547670 - METHOD FOR THE CATALYTIC GAS PHASE OXIDATION OF HYDROCARBONS AND CATALYSIS REACTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Süd-Chemie IP GmbH & Co. KG Lenbachplatz 6 80333 München / DE | [2013/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MESTL, Gerhard Ebereschenstr. 71 80935 München / DE | 02 /
WÖLK, Hans-Jörg Kaiserstrasse 22 83022 Rosenheim / DE | 03 /
KNEIssL, Sebastian Arnulfstr. 12 83026 Rosenheim / DE | 04 /
BÄUMLER, Christoph Poschenweg 5 Ortsteil Vagen 83620 Feldkirchen-Westerham / DE | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Stolmár & Partner Blumenstrasse 17 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11709121.5 | 18.03.2011 | WO2011EP54096 | Priority number, date | DE20101012090 | 19.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010012090 | [2013/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011113920 | Date: | 22.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2547670 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/89, C07C51/265, C07C51/31 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
C07C51/265 (EP);
C07C51/313 (EP);
C07D307/89 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/265, C07C63/16 (EP);
C07C51/313, C07C63/16 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KATALYTISCHEN GASPHASENOXIDATION VON KOHLENWASSERSTOFFEN UND KATALYSEREAKTIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/04] | English: | METHOD FOR THE CATALYTIC GAS PHASE OXIDATION OF HYDROCARBONS AND CATALYSIS REACTION DEVICE | [2013/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'OXYDATION CATALYTIQUE D'HYDROCARBURES EN PHASE GAZEUSE ET RÉACTEUR DE CATALYSE | [2013/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 28.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 20.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2830765 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [X] 1-15 * claim 1 * * figure 1 * * pages 15-20; examples 1-4 * * page 6 * * pages 13-14 *; | [X]EP1063222 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1,10 * * example 6 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0062] *; | [XI]WO0168626 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,10,12-15 * examples 1-4 * * claims 1,2 * * page 25, lines 1-24 * * page 26, lines 4-5; figure 1 * [I] 6,8,11; | [XA]WO2006069694 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 15 * claim 1 * * figure 1 *[A] 1-14; | [XI]US2007167648 (CREMER ULRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-10,13,15 * claims 1,4 * * paragraph [0431] - paragraph [0454] * * table 1 * [I] 6,11,12,14 | by applicant | US2035606 | DE1280756 | DE1642938 | DE2005969 | DE1769998 | DE2106796 | DE2159441 | DE19807018 | WO9837967 | DE19709589 | DE19828583 | WO9961433 | EP0964744 | DE10316418 | WO2004103561 | DE10344846 | WO2006069694 | WO2006125467 | WO2006125468 | - "Winnacker-Küchler", Chemische Technik, Prozesse und Produkte, WILEY-VCH, (2004), vol. 1 | - "Phthalic acid and Derivatives", K. TOWAE; W. ENKE; R. JäCKH; N. BHARGANA, Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, (1992), vol. A 20, page 181 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1938), vol. 60, page 309 |