EP2523673 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A BIOMASS COMPRISING PLANTARICIN AND USES THEREOF IN MEDICAL FIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GIULIANI S.p.A. Via Palagi, 2 I-20129 Milano / IT | [2012/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIULIANI Giammaria Giuliani S.p.A. Via Palagi 2 20129 Milano / IT | 02 /
BENEDUSI Anna Giuliani S.p.A. Via Palagi 2 20129 Milano / IT | 03 /
GOBBETTI Marco Dip. di Protezione delle Piante e Microbiologia Applicata Universita degli Studi di Bari Via Amendola 165/A 3° piano 70125 Bari / IT | 04 /
Dl CAGNO Raffaella Giuliani S.p.A. Via Palagi 2 20129 Milano / IT | 05 /
DE ANGELIS Maria Dip. di Protezione delle Piante e Microbiologia Applicata Universita degli Studi di Bari Via Amendola 165/A 3° piano 70125 Bari / IT | 06 /
CALASSO Maria Dip. di Protezione delle Piante e Microbiologia Applicata Universita degli Studi di Bari Via Amendola 165/A 3° piano 70125 Bari / IT | [2012/47] | Representative(s) | Gitto, Serena, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26 00187 Roma / IT | [2017/18] |
Former [2012/47] | Gitto, Serena, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 26 00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 11709193.4 | 04.01.2011 | [2017/18] | WO2011IT00003 | Priority number, date | IT2010RM00004 | 12.01.2010 Original published format: IT RM20100004 | [2012/47] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011086589 | Date: | 21.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2523673 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2523673 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61Q19/08, C12R1/25, C07K14/335, C12N1/20, C12P21/02, C12P39/00, C12R1/225, A61K38/16 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
A61K35/74 (EP,US);
A61K38/164 (US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/335 (EP,US);
C12N1/20 (EP,US);
C12N1/205 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/47] | A61K35/74, A61Q19/08, C12R1/25, C07K14/335, C12N1/20, C12P21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BIOMASSE MIT PLANTARICIN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN DER MEDIZIN | [2012/47] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF A BIOMASS COMPRISING PLANTARICIN AND USES THEREOF IN MEDICAL FIELD | [2012/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRÉPARATION D'UNE BIOMASSE COMPRENANT DE LA PLANTARICINE ET UTILISATIONS DE CELUI-CI DANS LE DOMAINE MÉDICAL | [2012/47] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 08.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.01.2011 | AL | 03.05.2017 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | GR | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | RS | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | IE | 04.01.2018 | LU | 04.01.2018 | MT | 04.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.01.2011 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
MT | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 04.01.2011 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
GR | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
MT | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 04.01.2011 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
MT | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
MT | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
MT | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 04.01.2018 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005196480 (SULLIVAN MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0071] *; | [A]WO2006000992 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 8, line 19 - page 10, line 5 * * page 11, line 31 - page 13, line 22 * * page 23 - page 29 *; | [A]EP2050434 (HOUSE WELLNESS FOODS CORP [JP]) [A] 8-12 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0009] ** claim 1 *; | [AD] - MALDONADO ANTONIO ET AL, "Production of plantaricin NC8 by Lactobacillus plantarum NC8 is induced in the presence of different types of gram-positive bacteria.", ARCHIVES OF MICROBIOLOGY, (200401), vol. 181, no. 1, ISSN 0302-8933, pages 8 - 16, XP002591121 [AD] 1-12 * page 9, column 1, paragraph 2 * * page 10; table 1 * * page 12, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 14, column 2, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00203-003-0606-8 | [A] - MALDONADO ANTONIO ET AL, "Induction of plantaricin production in Lactobacillus plantarum NC8 after coculture with specific gram-positive bacteria is mediated by an autoinduction mechanism.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (200403), vol. 186, no. 5, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 1556 - 1564, XP002591122 [A] 1-12 * page 1556, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 1558, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 1563, column 1, paragraph 1 * | [A] - PARENTE E ET AL, "Production, recovery and purification of bacteriocins from lactic acid bacteria", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199911), vol. 52, no. 5, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 628 - 638, XP002591123 [A] 1-12 * page 632, column 1, paragraphs 2,5 * | [A] - DZUNG BAO DIEP ET AL, "A BACTERIOCIN-LIKE PEPTIDE INDUCES BACTERIOCIN SYNTHESIS IN LACTOBACILLUS PLANTARUM C11", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (19950101), vol. 18, no. 4, doi:10.1111/J.1365-2958.1995.MMI_18040631.x, ISSN 0950-382X, pages 631 - 639, XP009016839 [A] 1-12 * page 632, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 637, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2958.1995.mmi_18040631.x | [A] - DE VUYST LUC ET AL, "The biodiversity of lactic acid bacteria in Greek traditional wheat sourdoughs is reflected in both composition and metabolite formation.", APPLIED AND ENVIRONMENTAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200212), vol. 68, no. 12, ISSN 0099-2240, pages 6059 - 6069, XP002591124 [A] 1-12 * page 6067, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.68.12.6059-6069.2002 | by applicant | - STURME ET AL., "Making sense of quorum sensing in lactobacilli: a special focus on Lactobacillus plantarum WCFA1", MICROBILOGY, (2007), vol. 153, pages 3939 - 3947 | - MILLER E BASSLER, "LuxS quorum sensing: more than just a numbers game", CURR OPIN MICROBIOL, (2003), vol. 6, pages 191 - 197 | - NAKAJAMA ET AL., "Gelatinase biosynthesis-activating pheromone: a peptide lactone that mediates a quorum sensing in Enterococcus faecalis", MOL MICROBIOL, (2001), vol. 41, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1365-2958.2001.02486.x, pages 145 - 154, XP009058781 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2958.2001.02486.x | - DIEP ET AL., "The gene encoding plantaricin A, a bacteriocin from Lactobacillus plantarum C11, is located on the same transcription unit as an agr-like regulatory system", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (1994), vol. 60, pages 160 - 166, XP000673869 | - MALDONADO ET AL., "Production of plantaricin NC8 by Lactobacillus plantarum NC8 is induced in the presence of different types of Gram-positive bacteria", ARCH MICROBIOL, (2004), vol. 181, doi:doi:10.1007/S00203-003-0606-8, pages 8 - 16, XP002591121 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/S00203-003-0606-8 | - HAUGE ET AL., "Plantaricin A is an ampkiphilic alpha-helical bacteriocin-like pheromone which exerts antimicrobial and pheromone activities through different mechanisms", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 37, pages 16026 - 16032 | - FUJIJA ET AL., "The Bacillus subtilis quorum-sensing molecule CSF contributes to intestinal homeostasis via OCTN2, a host cell membrane transporter", CELL HOST MICROBE, (2007), vol. 1, pages 299 - 308 | - GOBBETTI, "The sourdough microflora: interactions of lactic acid bacteria and sourdoughs", TRENDS FOOD SCI TECHNOL, (1998), vol. 9, pages 267 - 274 | - GOBBETTI, "The sourdough microflora: interactions of lactic acid bacteria and sourdoughs", TRENDS FOOD SKI TECHNOL, (1998), vol. 9, pages 267 - 274 | - ZWIETERING ET AL., "Modelling of bacterial growth curve", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL, (1990), vol. 56, pages 1875 - 1881 | - DE ANGELIS ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (2005), vol. 1762, pages 80 - 93 | - BINI ET AL., "Protein expression profiles in human breast ductal carcinoma and histologically normal tissue", ELECTROPHORESIS, (1997), vol. 18, pages 2831 - 2841 | - BALLS ET AL., Approaches to validation alternative methods in toxicology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1987), pages 45 - 58 | - DI CAGNO ET AL., "Cell-cell communication in sourdough lactic acid bacteria: a protomic study in Lactobacillus sanfranciscensis CB1", PROTEOMICS, (2007), vol. 7, pages 2430 - 2446 | - KOLODKIN-GAL ET AL., "A linear pentapeptide is a quorum-sensing factor required for mazef-mediated cell death in Escherichia coli", SCIENCE, (2007), vol. 318, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1147248, pages 652 - 655, XP002477943 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1147248 | - SAMBUY ET AL., "The Caco-2 cell line as a model of the intestinal barrier: influence of cell and culture-related factors on Cao-2 cell functional characteristics", CELL BIOL TOXICOL, (2005), vol. 21, doi:doi:10.1007/s10565-005-0085-6, pages 1 - 26, XP019234157 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10565-005-0085-6 | - PERRY, V.P.; SANFORD, K.K.; EVANS, V.J.; HYATT, G.W.; EARLE, W.R., "Establishment of clones of epithelial cells from human skin", J NATL CANCER INST., (1957), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 709 - 717 |