EP2544843 - WELDING SYSTEM WITH A POSITION DETECTION SYSTEM FOR THE WELDING DEVICE AND CONTROLLER THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2014/16] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026-1215 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHN, Peter Donald 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview Illinois 60026-1215 / US | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 11709274.2 | 08.03.2011 | WO2011US27611 | Priority number, date | US201113041205 | 04.03.2011 Original published format: US201113041205 | US20100312526P | 10.03.2010 Original published format: US 312526 P | [2013/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011112628 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2544843 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/095, G01P15/00, G01B11/00 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
B23K9/0953 (EP,US);
B23K9/0956 (EP,US);
G01B11/002 (EP,US);
G01B11/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Title | German: | SCHWEISSSYSTEM MIT POSITIONSERKENNUNGSSYSTEM FÜR DIE SCHWEISSVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNG DAFÜR | [2013/03] | English: | WELDING SYSTEM WITH A POSITION DETECTION SYSTEM FOR THE WELDING DEVICE AND CONTROLLER THEREFOR | [2013/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SOUDAGE, SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION DE POSITION POUR LE DISPOSITIF DE SOUDAGE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ASSOCIÉ | [2013/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 09.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US4163886 (OMAE TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 2, line 12 - line 25 * * column 3, line 6 - line 51 * * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 55; figures 3-4,10-11 * [Y] 14,18,19; | [XY]US4883938 (SARUGAKU SHINICHI [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,7-13,15,16 * column 2, line 7 - line 48 * * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 56 * * column 6, line 19 - column 10, line 42; figures 2-3,5-8 * [Y] 14,20; | [XY]EP0566212 (SCHELDE GROEP [NL]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 3, line 20 - line 26 * * column 5, line 2 - column 6, line 46; figures 1-2; claim 7 * [Y] 14; | [XY]US4559430 (HAYAKAWA YOSHITAKA [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 2, line 54 - line 56 * * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 29 * [Y] 14; | [XY]EP2027962 (INTERFORGE KLEE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7-13,15,16 * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0075] * * claim 6 * [Y] 14,18-21; | [A]JPS53102242 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]JPS5835077 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]JPS5732876 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 2,3,5 * abstract *; | [A]JPS62259673 (SUMIKIN WELDING IND) [A] 2,3,5 * abstract *; | [XY]US6385857 (WEINBERG DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 16 * column 4, line 6 - column 6, line 63; figures 2,3,4,5 * [Y] 18-21; | [XY]US2008314887 (STOGER MARKUS [AT], et al) [X] 16,17,21 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0027]; figures 3,4,8,9 * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0085] * [Y] 18-20 | by applicant | US4163886 | US4883938 | EP0566212 | US4559430 | EP2029962 | JPS53102242 | JPS5835077 | JPS5732876 | JPS6225963 | US6385857 | US2008314887 |