EP2678456 - PROCESS FOR TREATING ALUMINIUM SLAGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aumund Fördertechnik GmbH Saalhoffer Straße 17 47495 Rheinberg / DE | [2014/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORITZ, Matthias Raafstraße 66 52076 Aachen / DE | 02 /
NIEDZWIEDZ, Christian 33 Ulmenallee 47495 Rheinberg / DE | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Müller, Karl-Ernst, et al Turmstraße 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [2014/01] | Application number, filing date | 11709865.7 | 25.02.2011 | WO2011EP00926 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012113418 | Date: | 30.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2678456 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2678456 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C22B7/04, C22B21/00 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
C22B7/04 (EP,US);
C22B21/0007 (US);
C22B1/005 (US);
C22B21/0069 (EP,US);
Y02P10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ALUMINIUMSCHLACKEN | [2014/01] | English: | PROCESS FOR TREATING ALUMINIUM SLAGS | [2014/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE SCORIES D'ALUMINIUM | [2014/01] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 02.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2011 | AL | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | ES | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MK | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | NL | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | RS | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | SM | 18.03.2015 | NO | 18.06.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 25.02.2011 | |
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MK | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.02.2011 | |
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MK | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HR | 18.03.2015 | |
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | HR | 18.03.2015 | |
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
RS | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | HR | 18.03.2015 | |
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | HR | 18.03.2015 | |
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | |
NO | 18.06.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3534910 (BRUMAGIN THOMAS H, et al) [A] 1-12* figure 1 *; | [A]US4039173 (PAPAFINGOS PANDELIS N, et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4394978 (WEISS ANTON [AT]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,2 *; | [XAI]EP0232221 (ALUSUISSE [CH]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 31 - column 4, line 19; figures 1,2 * [A] 9-12 [I] 2,4-8; | [A]JP2001020020 (DAIDO STEEL CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * Patent Abstracts of Japan * | by applicant | WO2004074521 |