EP2529519 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGING MOBILE RESOURCE USAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHU, Hua 1580 Jasper Drive Sunnyvale CA 94087 / US | 02 /
SOMADDER, Gurudas 461 Mill River Lane San Jose CA 95134 / US | 03 /
CALIPPE, Joel, R. 751 E Taylor Street San Jose CA 95112 / US | 04 /
ORTEGA, Claudio, A. 412 Iris Street Redwood City CA 94062 / US | [2012/49] | Representative(s) | Wetzel, Emmanuelle, et al Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/10] | Knecht, Ulrich Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/49] | Zinsinger, Norbert Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz P.O. Box 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11710060.2 | 17.01.2011 | [2017/10] | WO2011US21468 | Priority number, date | US20100696520 | 29.01.2010 Original published format: US 696520 | [2012/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011094083 | Date: | 04.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2529519 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2529519 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/00, H04W28/18, H04W28/08, H04W28/24, H04W72/04 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
H04W28/24 (EP,US);
H04W72/04 (US);
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04W72/00 (US);
H04W72/23 (US)
|
Former IPC [2012/49] | H04L12/56, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERWALTUNG DER NUTZUNG VON MOBILEN RESSOURCEN | [2012/49] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MANAGING MOBILE RESOURCE USAGE | [2012/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE GESTION D'UTILISATION DE RESSOURCES MOBILES | [2012/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 12.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.01.2011 | AL | 08.03.2017 | AT | 08.03.2017 | CY | 08.03.2017 | CZ | 08.03.2017 | DK | 08.03.2017 | EE | 08.03.2017 | ES | 08.03.2017 | FI | 08.03.2017 | HR | 08.03.2017 | IT | 08.03.2017 | LT | 08.03.2017 | LV | 08.03.2017 | MC | 08.03.2017 | MK | 08.03.2017 | NL | 08.03.2017 | PL | 08.03.2017 | RO | 08.03.2017 | RS | 08.03.2017 | SE | 08.03.2017 | SI | 08.03.2017 | SK | 08.03.2017 | SM | 08.03.2017 | TR | 08.03.2017 | BG | 08.06.2017 | NO | 08.06.2017 | GR | 09.06.2017 | IS | 08.07.2017 | PT | 10.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 17.01.2011 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CY | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
MK | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 17.01.2011 | |
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
TR | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
MC | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SI | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
DK | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
SM | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
PT | 10.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
PL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 08.03.2017 | |
CZ | 08.03.2017 | ||
EE | 08.03.2017 | ||
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RO | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
SK | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
IS | 08.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 08.03.2017 | |
ES | 08.03.2017 | ||
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | ES | 08.03.2017 | |
FI | 08.03.2017 | ||
HR | 08.03.2017 | ||
LT | 08.03.2017 | ||
LV | 08.03.2017 | ||
NL | 08.03.2017 | ||
RS | 08.03.2017 | ||
SE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BG | 08.06.2017 | ||
NO | 08.06.2017 | ||
GR | 09.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005017707 (TELCORDIA TECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, line 9 - page 4, line 3 * * page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 22 * * page 10, line 3 - page 17, line 6 * * page 24, line 9 - page 30, line 8 *; | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; Policy and Charging Control signalling flows and QoS parameter mapping; (Release 9)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 29.213, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20091218), no. V9.1.0, pages 1 - 127, XP050401209 [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [05.3] - paragraph [05.4] * * paragraph [D.3.1.2] * * figures D.3.1.2.1,D.3.1.2.2 * | [A] - "Telecommunications and Internet converged Services and Protocols for Advanced Networking (TISPAN); Requirements for QoS in a NGN; ETSI TS 181 018", 2. AVC MEETING; 23-05-1991 - 31-05-1991; PARIS ; (CCITT SGXV EXPERTGROUP FOR ATM VIDEO CODING), LIS, SOPHIA ANTIPOLIS CEDEX, FRANCE, (20070801), vol. TISPAN, no. V2.0.0, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014040368 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US20100696425 | US20100696642 |