|
12.01.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2016 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2016 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.12.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
70 |
|
26.08.2016 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
10.05.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
17.10.2014 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2014 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
11.09.2014 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.07.2014 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2014 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.05.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2014 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.09.2013 |
Registration under Rule 23 EPC |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
12.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2012 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2012 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2012 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.08.2012 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.01.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.11.2011 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.10.2011 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.08.2011 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
81 |
|
04.08.2011 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
59 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
24.03.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
2 |