10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
06.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] |
21.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
12.01.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
29.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] |
22.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.10.2017 [2017/43] |
15.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
17.03.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
03.02.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.12.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
23.12.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.12.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.10.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
25.08.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.08.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
05.08.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
02.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.10.2014 |
Change - Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
18.07.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
05.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.08.2013 |
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution |
published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] |
05.04.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] |
15.03.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.11.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
02.11.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
18.09.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|