Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8970079 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2015 | B2 | US2013062982 | 14.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010013682 | 01.04.2010 | WO2011EP53423 | 08.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101824749B | Global Dossier | 01.02.2018 | B1 | KR20130019409 | 26.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102010013682 | 01.04.2010 | WO2011EP53423 | 08.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5661914B | Global Dossier | 28.01.2015 | B2 | JP2013527898 | 04.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102010013682 | 01.04.2010 | WO2011EP53423 | 08.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102812262B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2015 | B | CN102812262 | 05.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102010013682 | 01.04.2010 | WO2011EP53423 | 08.03.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2553284 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010013682 | 01.04.2010 | WO2011EP53423 | 08.03.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011120764 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010013682 | 01.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102010013682 | 10.06.2020 | B4 | DE102010013682 | 06.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102010013682 | 01.04.2010 |