EP2547376 - DEVICE FOR REGULATING AT LEAST ONE FILTRATION VALUE AND HAEMODIALYSIS MACHINE WITH SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/04] | DEVICE FOR REGULATING AT LEAST ONE FILTRATION VALUE, HAEMODIALYSIS MACHINE AND CORRESPONDING METHOD AND USE | ||
[2015/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2013/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERS, Arne Foellerweg 3 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | 02 /
HEIDE, Alexander Am Woogberg 5A 65817 Eppstein / DE | 03 /
WIKTOR, Christoph Am Platz 5 63571 Gelnhausen / DE | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11710694.8 | 17.03.2011 | WO2011EP01333 | Priority number, date | DE20101012050 | 19.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010012050 | [2013/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011113602 | Date: | 22.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2547376 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2547376 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10, A61M1/14 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
A61M1/14 (EP,US);
A61M1/1601 (EP,US);
A61M1/34 (EP,US);
A61M1/3403 (EP,US);
A61M1/36 (EP,US);
A61M1/3607 (EP,US);
A61M1/36225 (EP,US);
A61M1/3693 (EP,US);
A61M1/38 (EP,US);
A61M60/113 (EP,US);
A61M60/232 (EP,US);
A61M60/37 (EP,US);
A61M60/847 (EP,US);
A61M60/849 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3375 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG WENIGSTENS EINES FILTRATIONSWERTES UND HÄMODIALYSEMASCHINE MIT EINER DERARTIGEN VORRICHTUNG | [2015/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR REGULATING AT LEAST ONE FILTRATION VALUE AND HAEMODIALYSIS MACHINE WITH SUCH A DEVICE | [2015/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION D'AU MOINS UNE VALEUR DE FILTRATION ET HÉMODIALYSEUR AVEC UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2015/01] |
Former [2013/04] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR REGELUNG WENIGSTENS EINES FILTRATIONSWERTES, HÄMODIALYSEMASCHINE SOWIE VERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG HIERZU | ||
Former [2013/04] | DEVICE FOR REGULATING AT LEAST ONE FILTRATION VALUE, HAEMODIALYSIS MACHINE AND CORRESPONDING METHOD AND USE | ||
Former [2013/04] | DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION D'AU MOINS UNE VALEUR DE FILTRATION, HÉMODIALYSEUR, PROCÉDÉ ET UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 10.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 25.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2011 | AL | 06.05.2015 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | DK | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | ES | 06.05.2015 | FI | 06.05.2015 | HR | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | MK | 06.05.2015 | MT | 06.05.2015 | NL | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | RS | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | SM | 06.05.2015 | TR | 06.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | NO | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 17.03.2011 | |
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 17.03.2011 | |
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 06.05.2015 | |
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 06.05.2015 | |
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4781525 (HUBBARD LLOYD C [US], et al) [A] 1,22 * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 9 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]WO9631934 (SULZER ELECTRONICS AG [CH], et al) [X] 21,22,24 * page 15, line 31 - page 16, line 13 * * page 24, lines 1-17 * * figures 2, 8 * [Y] 7,8,20; | [XDAY]EP0967475 (SULZER ELECTRONICS AG [CH], et al) [XD] 22 * paragraphs [0025] - [0041] * * figure 1 * [A] 18 [Y] 1-17,19,20,23,25-27; | [YA]EP1424089 (GAMBRO HOSPAL SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [Y] 1-17,19,20,23,25-27 * paragraphs [0018] - [0035] * * figure 1 * [A] 18; | [YA]WO2005063320 (GAMBRO LUNDIA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 11,12 * page 15, line 20 - page 16, line 28 * * claims 24, 28, 29 * [A] 1; | [A]WO2006135934 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [A] 7,8,20,21 * page 13, lines 8-23 ** figure 8 * | by applicant | EP0967475 | US6439845 | EP0867195 | EP1284369 | EP1284370 | DE10224750 | EP1661593 | EP2037236 | - CLINICAL SCIENCE, (1984), vol. 66, pages 575 - 583 | - Brookshier und Tarbell beschreiben in Biorheology, PERGAMON PRESS, (1992), vol. 28, pages 569 - 587 |