EP2556217 - POWER PLANT LINE HAVING A VARIABLE-SPEED PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Straße 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2019/49] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAF, Hartmut Lortzingstrasse 52 73660 Urbach / DE | 02 /
HILPERT, Karl Reinthalerstrasse 43 74564 Crailsheim / DE | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11710697.1 | 18.03.2011 | WO2011EP01344 | Priority number, date | DE20101014588 | 09.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010014588 | [2013/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011124322 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2556217 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01K9/02, F02C7/36, F16H47/08 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
F16H47/085 (EP,KR,US);
F01K9/02 (EP,KR,US);
F01D15/12 (KR);
F02C7/36 (EP,KR,US);
F16H47/08 (KR);
Y02E20/16 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/07] | F01K/ | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Title | German: | KRAFTWERKSSTRANG MIT EINER DREHZAHLVARIABLEN PUMPE | [2013/07] | English: | POWER PLANT LINE HAVING A VARIABLE-SPEED PUMP | [2013/07] | French: | LIGNE DE CENTRALE COMPRENANT UNE POMPE À RÉGIME VARIABLE | [2020/12] |
Former [2013/07] | BRANCHE DE CENTRALE COMPRENANT UNE POMPE VARIABLE EN RÉGIME | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 27.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/53] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1208831 (VOITH GETRIEBE KG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 1, line 8 - line 78 * * column 2, line 116 - column 3, line 55 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US3626692 (KUMM EMERSON L) [A] 1,4,5* page 1, column 2, line 52 - page 2, column 4, line 44; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4204401 (EARNEST ERNEST R [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,9 * column 7, line 27 - line 38; figure 5 *; | [Y]US4726255 (HUMPFER RUDOLF [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,9 * column 1, line 10 - column 3, line 25 * * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 52 * * figure 2 * | Examination | US4087860 | WO9815777 | WO2008065517 | by applicant | WO2010009836 |