EP2567122 - POWER TRANSMISSION BELT, IN PARTICULAR TOOTHED BELT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2021 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ContiTech Antriebssysteme GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2013/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELL, Michael Flachsrottenweg 4 A 38159 Vechelde / DE | 02 /
TEVES, Reinhard Kurze Wende 4 30926 Seelze / DE | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Preusser, Andrea Continental Aktiengesellschaft Intellectual Property Postfach 169 30001 Hannover / DE | [2013/11] | Application number, filing date | 11710770.6 | 24.03.2011 | [2020/23] | WO2011EP54508 | Priority number, date | DE20101017782 | 07.07.2010 Original published format: DE102010017782 | DE20101016757 | 03.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010016757 | [2013/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011138088 | Date: | 10.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2567122 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2567122 | Date: | 03.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16G1/10, F16G1/28 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
F16G1/10 (EP,US);
F16G1/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRAFTÜBERTRAGUNGSRIEMEN, INSBESONDERE ZAHNRIEMEN | [2013/11] | English: | POWER TRANSMISSION BELT, IN PARTICULAR TOOTHED BELT | [2013/11] | French: | COURROIE DE TRANSFERT DE FORCE, NOTAMMENT COURROIE CRANTÉE | [2013/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2012 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/11] | 08.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2011 | AL | 03.06.2020 | CY | 03.06.2020 | CZ | 03.06.2020 | DK | 03.06.2020 | EE | 03.06.2020 | ES | 03.06.2020 | FI | 03.06.2020 | HR | 03.06.2020 | IT | 03.06.2020 | LT | 03.06.2020 | LV | 03.06.2020 | MC | 03.06.2020 | MK | 03.06.2020 | MT | 03.06.2020 | NL | 03.06.2020 | PL | 03.06.2020 | RO | 03.06.2020 | RS | 03.06.2020 | SE | 03.06.2020 | SI | 03.06.2020 | SK | 03.06.2020 | SM | 03.06.2020 | TR | 03.06.2020 | BG | 03.09.2020 | NO | 03.09.2020 | GR | 04.09.2020 | IS | 03.10.2020 | PT | 06.10.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 24.03.2011 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
TR | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.03.2011 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
MK | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 24.03.2011 | |
AL | 03.06.2020 | ||
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CY | 03.06.2020 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
MC | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SI | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
DK | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
PL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SK | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
IS | 03.10.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
CZ | 03.06.2020 | ||
EE | 03.06.2020 | ||
ES | 03.06.2020 | ||
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
IT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RO | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
SM | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
PT | 06.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 03.06.2020 | |
FI | 03.06.2020 | ||
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
NL | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
BG | 03.09.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
RS | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
HR | 03.06.2020 | ||
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
LV | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
GR | 04.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 03.06.2020 | |
LT | 03.06.2020 | ||
SE | 03.06.2020 | ||
NO | 03.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 03.06.2020 | |
NO | 03.09.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0674121 (TSUBAKIMOTO CHAIN CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,11 * tables 1-3 * * figure 1 *; | [X]US5698650 (JOURDAIN ERIC PAUL [BE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9 * column 7, line 30 - line 38 * * column 8, line 12 - column 9, line 5 * * column 9, line 25 - line 60 * * column 14, line 60 - line 67 *; | [X]EP1239004 (BAYER INC [CA]) [X] 1,5-8,11 * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0003] * * table 1 *; | [X]US6491598 (ROSENBOOM JAY AHREN [US]) [X] 1,3,6-11 * figures 1-2 * * column 1, line 58 - column 5, line 57 * * table 1 *; | [X]US2002187869 (MARTIN DIETER [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,11 * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0083] * * figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [X]WO2008070878 (VEYANCE TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10,11 * table 1 * * table 2 * * table 4 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP2006574 (MITSUBOSHI BELTING LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,6-11 * figure 1 * * table 1 *; | [T] - DEUTSCHE INSTITUT FÜR NORMUNG, "Beschichtungsstoffe und Beschichtungen - Ergänzende Begriffe zu DIN EN ISO 4618", DEUTSCHE NORMEN. DIN NORM,, (20070301), no. 55945, XP008128686 [T] 1-11 | [T] - "DIN EN ISO 4618 - Beschichtungsstoffe. Begriffe (ISO 4618:2006); Dreisprachige Fassung EN ISO 4618:2006 = Paints and varnisches. Terms and definitions (ISO 4618:2006); Trilingual version EN ISO 4618:2006 = Peintures et vernis. Termes et definitions (ISO 4618:2006); Version trilingue EN ISO 4618:2006", DEUTSCHE NORMEN. DIN NORM,, (20070301), vol. 4618, XP009101893 [T] 1-11 | Examination | DE102008033267 | by applicant | DE2615656 | EP0547880 | DE69502430T | DE69231029T | DE69915095T | DE102004052255 | WO2005080821 | DE602005006210T |