EP2539515 - LOAD BEARING CONSTRUCTION PILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reid, Stephen James Willow Cottage Mellis Road Yaxley, Eye IP23 8DB / GB | For all designated states Wincott, Nicholas James 92 Champernowne Modbury Ivybridge, Devon PL21 0RE / GB | [2013/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/01] | Representative(s) | Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich IP5 3SL / GB | [2018/17] |
Former [2013/01] | Gemmell, Peter Alan, et al Dummett Copp LLP 25 The Square Martlesham Heath Ipswich, Suffolk IP5 3SL / GB | Application number, filing date | 11710826.6 | 25.02.2011 | [2018/17] | WO2011GB50374 | Priority number, date | GB20100003179 | 25.02.2010 Original published format: GB 201003179 | [2013/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011104559 | Date: | 01.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2539515 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2539515 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F24J3/08, F28F13/06, F24J2/46, E02D27/16 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
E02D27/16 (EP,US);
E02D5/22 (GB);
E02D27/32 (GB);
E02D5/56 (GB);
F24T10/10 (GB);
F24T10/17 (EP,US);
F28F13/06 (EP,US);
F24S2080/05 (EP,US);
F28F2255/06 (EP,US);
Y02E10/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/01] | E02D27/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASTTRAGENDER BAUPFEILER | [2013/01] | English: | LOAD BEARING CONSTRUCTION PILE | [2013/01] | French: | PILE DE CONSTRUCTION PORTEUSE | [2013/01] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 24.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | HR | 25.04.2018 | LT | 25.04.2018 | LV | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | MK | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | RS | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | SM | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/26] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CY | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/45] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
SM | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 25.04.2018 | |
HR | 25.04.2018 | ||
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
LV | 25.04.2018 | ||
RS | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | HR | 25.04.2018 | |
LT | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | LT | 25.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0189733 (GUT LEO) [A] 1-15,21,22 * page 4, line 20 - page 7, line 7; figures 1-8 *; | [A]EP0582118 (SACAC HERGISWIL AG [CH]) [A] 1-15,21,22* abstract *; | [XA]EP1243875 (BETON SON BV [NL]) [X] 1-3 * column 4, line 15 - column 7, line 23; figures 1-3 * [A] 4-15,21,22 |