EP2550305 - CONTINUOUS PROCESS FOR PREPARING POLYFLUOROACRYLATE PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Relypsa, Inc. 100 Cardinal Way Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2018/10] |
Former [2014/08] | For all designated states Relypsa, Inc. 700 Saginaw Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | ||
Former [2013/05] | For all designated states Relypsa, Inc. 5301 Patrick Henry Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TYSON, George 13472 Robleda Road Los Altos Hills, CA 95054 / US | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2018/10] |
Former [2013/05] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11711211.0 | 18.03.2011 | [2018/10] | WO2011US28950 | Priority number, date | US20100315937P | 20.03.2010 Original published format: US 315937 P | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011119422 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2550305 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2550305 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/00 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
C08F2/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F20/22 (KR);
C08F2/01 (KR,US);
C08F212/36 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/24 (EP,KR,US);
C08F36/04 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTINUIERLICHES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYFLUORACRYLATPARTIKELN | [2013/05] | English: | CONTINUOUS PROCESS FOR PREPARING POLYFLUOROACRYLATE PARTICLES | [2013/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ CONTINU DE PRÉPARATION DE PARTICULES D'ACRYLATE POLYFLUORÉ | [2013/05] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 19.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2011 | AL | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | DK | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | FI | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | RS | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | LU | 18.03.2018 | MT | 18.03.2018 | BG | 07.06.2018 | NO | 07.06.2018 | IS | 07.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 18.03.2011 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
MK | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
MT | 18.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 18.03.2011 | |
AL | 07.03.2018 | ||
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
MT | 18.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
MT | 18.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
DK | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 18.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 07.06.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
FI | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
NO | 07.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2010022382 (RELYPSA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0013] - [0025] - [0030] - [0033] , [0035] , [0040] - [0043] *; | [I]WO2010022383 (RELYPSA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0007] - [0017] - [0026] - [0033] - [0077] , [0083] , [0087] - [0094] - [ 103] , [0109] *; | [I]WO2010022380 (RELYPSA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraphs [0007] - [0016] - [0025] , [0030] - [0034] - [0041] - [0046] - [0060] *; | [I]WO2010022381 (RELYPSA INC [US], et al) [I] 1-5,8-13,18 * paragraphs [0044] - [0065] * | by applicant | WO2005097081 | WO2010022381 | WO2010022382 | WO2010022383 |