EP2553942 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING A PLURALITY OF LOUDSPEAKERS AND MICROPHONE ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27 80686 München / DE | [2014/17] |
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILZLE, Andreas Weiselstr. 5 91054 Buckendorf / DE | 02 /
THIERGART, Oliver Poststr. 10 91301 Fuerth / DE | 03 /
DEL GALDO, Giovanni Neue Länder 20 98693 Martinroda / DE | 04 /
LANG, Matthias Neuhas 16 92334 Berching / DE | [2013/52] |
Former [2013/06] | 01 /
SILZLE, Andreas Weiselstr. 5 91054 Buckendorf / DE | ||
02 /
THIERGART, Oliver Poststr. 10 90301 Fuerth / DE | |||
03 /
DEL GALDO, Giovanni Neue Länder 20 986930 Martinroda / DE | |||
04 /
LANG, Matthias Neuhas 16 92334 Berching / DE | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11711335.7 | 30.03.2011 | WO2011EP54877 | Priority number, date | EP20100159914 | 14.04.2010 Original published format: EP 10159914 | US20100319712P | 31.03.2010 Original published format: US 319712 P | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011121004 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2553942 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2553942 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04R5/04, H04R29/00, H04R1/40, H04R5/027 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
H04R29/002 (EP,KR,US);
H04R1/406 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04R5/027 (EP,KR,US);
H04R3/005 (US);
H04S7/301 (EP,KR,US);
H04R1/02 (US);
H04R1/08 (US);
H04R2201/02 (US);
H04R2201/401 (EP,KR,US);
H04R2420/05 (US);
H04R2430/21 (US);
H04S2400/03 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Messen einer Vielzahl von Lautsprechern und Mikrofonanordnung | [2013/49] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING A PLURALITY OF LOUDSPEAKERS AND MICROPHONE ARRAY | [2013/06] | French: | Appareil et procédé de mesure d'une pluralité de haut-parleurs et réseau de microphones | [2013/06] |
Former [2013/06] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN EINER VIELZAHL VON LAUTSPRECHERN UND MIKROFONANORDNUNG | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 17.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13197826.4 / EP2731353 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2011 | AL | 23.04.2014 | AT | 23.04.2014 | BE | 23.04.2014 | CY | 23.04.2014 | CZ | 23.04.2014 | DK | 23.04.2014 | EE | 23.04.2014 | FI | 23.04.2014 | HR | 23.04.2014 | LT | 23.04.2014 | LV | 23.04.2014 | MC | 23.04.2014 | MK | 23.04.2014 | MT | 23.04.2014 | RO | 23.04.2014 | RS | 23.04.2014 | SE | 23.04.2014 | SI | 23.04.2014 | SK | 23.04.2014 | SM | 23.04.2014 | BG | 23.07.2014 | NO | 23.07.2014 | GR | 24.07.2014 | IS | 23.08.2014 | PT | 25.08.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 30.03.2011 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MK | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.03.2011 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 23.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP0869697 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 13,17 * figures 22,24 * * page 14, line 19 - line 24 * * page 14, line 57 - page 15, line 13 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 14,16; | [XYI]JP2001025085 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,2,10,11 * figures 1-17 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] , [0018] , [0021] * * paragraphs [0028] , [0037] , [0040] , [0042] * [Y] 7-9 [I] 3-6,12; | [A]EP1286175 (MITEL KNOWLEDGE CORP [CA]) [A] 1-6,9-12 * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0028] - [0031] *; | [Y]EP1544635 (NITTOBO ACOUSTIC ENGINEERING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 9 * figures 4,8 * * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0052] *; | [A]JP2006211047 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 7,8,13-17* figure 5 *; | [XYI]EP1933596 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,10,11 * figures 1-5,12 * * paragraphs [0021] , [0025] , [0029] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0033] * [Y] 7-9 [I] 4-6,12; | [Y]EP1983799 (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]) [Y] 9 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0018] *; | [XYI]WO2009077152 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 13,17 * figure 7 * * page 24, line 7 - line 19 * [Y] 7,8 [I] 14,16 | by applicant | - "Methods for the subjective assessment of small impairments in audio systems including multichannel sound systems", ITU-R Recommendation-BS. 1116-1, INTERN. TELECOM UNION, (1997), page 26 | - S. MULLER, P. MASSARANI, "Transfer-Function Measurement with Sweeps", J. AUDIO ENG. SOC., (200106), vol. 49, XP001115804 | - V. PULKKI, "Spatial sound reproduction with directional audio coding", JOURNAL OF THE AES, (2007), vol. 55, no. 6, pages 503 - 516 | - ST350 Portable Microphone System, User Manual |