EP2552471 - NOVEL PEPTIDES AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELI LILLY AND COMPANY Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, IN 46285 / US | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALSINA-FERNANDEZ, Jorge Eli Lilly And Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | 02 /
BOKVIST, Krister Bengt Eli Lilly And Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | 03 /
GUO, Lili Eli Lilly And Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | 04 /
MAYER, John Philip Eli Lilly And Company Lilly Corporate Center Indianapolis, Indiana 46285 / US | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Kent, Lindsey Ruth Eli Lilly and Company Limited 8 Arlington Square West Downshire Way Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Kent, Lindsey Ruth Eli Lilly and Company Limited Lilly Research Center European Patent Operations Sunninghill Road, Earl Wood Manor, Windlesham Surrey GU20 6PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 11711424.9 | 23.03.2011 | [2016/11] | WO2011US29501 | Priority number, date | US20100317850P | 26.03.2010 Original published format: US 317850 P | [2013/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011119657 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2552471 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2552471 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, C07K14/47, C07K14/62, A61K38/30, A61K38/26, C07K14/605 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
C07K14/605 (EP,US);
A61K38/16 (KR);
A61K38/30 (KR);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
C07K14/47 (KR);
C07K14/62 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | 26.10.2012 | ME | 26.10.2012 | Title | German: | NEUE PEPTIDE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2015/36] | English: | NOVEL PEPTIDES AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION AND USE | [2013/06] | French: | PEPTIDES NOUVELLES, DES PROCEDES POUR LEUR PREPARATIONS ET LEUR UTILISATIONS | [2015/43] |
Former [2013/06] | NEUEARTIGE PEPTIDE SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2013/06] | NOUVEAUX PEPTIDES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 24.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2011 | AL | 16.03.2016 | AT | 16.03.2016 | BE | 16.03.2016 | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | MK | 16.03.2016 | NL | 16.03.2016 | PL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | RS | 16.03.2016 | SE | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | SM | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | IE | 23.03.2016 | LU | 23.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | NO | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
MT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
LU | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
MT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2010016940 (IPSEN PHARMA SAS [FR], et al) [ID] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [ID]WO2010016944 (IPSEN PHARMA SAS [FR], et al) [ID] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [ID]WO2010011439 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [ID] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2010016940 | WO2010016944 | WO2010011439 | - MARKALONIS, J.J., BIOCHEM., (1969), vol. 113, page 299 | - SUN, S., ALMADEN, J., CARLSON, T.J., BARKER, J., GEHRING, M.R., "Assay development and data analysis of receptor-ligand binding based on scintillation proximity assay", MELAB ENG., (2005), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ymben.2004.05.004, pages 38 - 44, XP004753537 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymben.2004.05.004 | - CHCNG, Y., PRUSOFF, W. H., BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL., (1973), vol. 22, pages 3099 - 3108 | - GRAZIANO MP, HEY PJ, BORKOWSKI D, CHICCHI GG, STRADER CD, BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (1993), vol. 196, no. 1, pages 141 - 6 | - GRINNELL, B.W., BERG, D.T., WALLS, J., YAN, S.B., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1987), vol. 5, pages 1189 - 1192 | - LOK, S, GENE, (1994), vol. 140, no. 2, pages 203 - 209 | - GRINNELL, B.W., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1987), vol. 5, pages 1189 - 1192 | - GRAZIANO MP, HEY PJ, BORKOWSKI D, CHICCHI GG, STRADER CD, BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (19931015), vol. 196, no. 1, pages 141 - 6 | - ENDOCRINOLOGY, vol. 144, pages 2008 - 2015 |