EP2552253 - PERFORATED CIGARETTE PAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states delfortgroup AG Fabrikstrasse 20 4050 Traun / AT | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EITZINGER, Bernhard Scharnsteinerstrasse 6 A-4810 Gmunden / AT | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/06] | Lucke, Andreas Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11711482.7 | 30.03.2011 | [2016/39] | WO2011EP01602 | Priority number, date | DE20101013669 | 01.04.2010 Original published format: DE102010013669 | [2013/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011120687 | Date: | 06.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2552253 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2552253 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A24D1/02, A24D1/10 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
A24D1/10 (EP,KR,US);
A24D1/02 (KR);
A24D1/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERFORIERTES ZIGARETTENPAPIER | [2013/06] | English: | PERFORATED CIGARETTE PAPER | [2013/06] | French: | PAPIER À CIGARETTE PERFORÉ | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 14.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.03.2011 | AL | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | MT | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | IE | 30.03.2017 | LU | 30.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 30.03.2011 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 30.03.2011 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 30.03.2011 | |
AL | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
IE | 30.03.2017 | ||
LU | 30.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
LU | 30.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 28.09.2016 | |
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US4924888 (PERFETTI THOMAS A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,10,16,17,19 * column 3, line 37 - column 12, line 2 * [Y] 13,14 [I] 13,18; | [XYI]EP1234514 (LORILLARD LICENSING COMPANY LL [US]) [X] 1-8,13-17,19 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0046] * [Y] 3,13,14 [I] 18; | [Y]US2009120450 (HERVE RAOUL [FR], et al) [Y] 14* paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] *; | [XYI]CN201360534Y (YUNSHENG SONG [CN]) [X] 1-12,15-17,19 * abstract * [Y] 3,13,14 [I] 18 |