EP2550664 - PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PACKING FOR DISPOSAL OF WASTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/05] | CONTAINER FOR STORING WASTE | ||
[2013/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ald Vacuum Technologies GmbH Wilhelm-Rohn-Straße 35 63450 Hanau / DE | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HROVAT, Milan Meisenweg 7 63517 Rodenbach / DE | 02 /
SEEMANN, Richard Kirchstr. 11 63456 Hanau / DE | 03 /
GROSSE, Karl-Heinz Steinbach 2 63584 Gründau / DE | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Prasch, Andrea Darinka Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Westhafenplatz 1 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/05] | Hrovat, Andrea Darinka FUCHS Patentanwälte Westhafenplatz 1 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 11711513.9 | 24.03.2011 | WO2011EP54549 | Priority number, date | DE20101003289 | 25.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010003289 | [2013/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011117354 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2550664 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2550664 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G21F9/22, G21F9/36, G21F5/005 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
G21F9/36 (EP,KR,US);
G21F5/005 (EP,KR,US);
G21F9/22 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GEBINDEN ZUR LAGERUNG VON ABFÄLLEN | [2013/35] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PACKING FOR DISPOSAL OF WASTE | [2013/35] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA PRODUCTION DES EMBALLAGES POUR LE STOCKAGE DES DECHETS | [2013/35] |
Former [2013/05] | GEBINDE ZUR LAGERUNG VON ABFÄLLEN | ||
Former [2013/05] | CONTAINER FOR STORING WASTE | ||
Former [2013/05] | COLIS POUR LE STOCKAGE DE DÉCHETS | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2012 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 07.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2011 | AL | 25.12.2013 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | HR | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | MK | 25.12.2013 | MT | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RS | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | SM | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | IE | 24.03.2014 | LU | 24.03.2014 | NO | 25.03.2014 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 24.03.2011 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MK | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 24.03.2011 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 24.03.2011 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | HR | 25.12.2013 | |
RS | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | HR | 25.12.2013 | |
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | NO | 25.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE10329170 (POLYBERN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7,14,15 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0043]; claims 1-18 * [A] 8-13; | [A]DE2551349 (EUROPAEISCHE GES FUER DIE CHEM, et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]AT375207B (SOLOMON PAUL DIPL ING [AT]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2010052321 |