EP2550185 - INFLATABLE AIRBAG ARRANGEMENT IN A DASHBOARD, COMPRISING A FLAP CONNECTED TO THE DASHBOARD BY MEANS OF A LINEAR LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/05] | INFLATABLE AIRBAG ARRANGEMENT IN A DASHBOARD, COMPRISING A FLAP CONNECTED TO THE DASHBOARD BY MEANS OF A LINEAR LINK | ||
[2014/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faurecia Intérieur Industrie 2, rue Hennape 92000 Nanterre / FR | [2013/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORY, Daniel 12 rue René Hantelle F-95130 Le Plessis-Bouchard / FR | [2013/05] | Representative(s) | Beaudouin-Lafon, Emmanuel, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [2013/05] | Application number, filing date | 11711771.3 | 23.03.2011 | WO2011EP01444 | Priority number, date | FR20100052137 | 24.03.2010 Original published format: FR 1052137 | [2013/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011116950 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2550185 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2550185 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/216 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
B60R21/216 (EP,US);
B60R21/205 (US);
B60R2021/21537 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBLASBARE AIRBAGANORDNUNG AUF EINEM ARMATURENBRETT MIT EINER ÜBER EINE LINEARE VERBINDUNG MIT DEM ARMATURENBRETT VERBUNDENEN KLAPPE | [2014/44] | English: | INFLATABLE AIRBAG ARRANGEMENT IN A DASHBOARD, COMPRISING A FLAP CONNECTED TO THE DASHBOARD BY MEANS OF A LINEAR LINK | [2014/44] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE COUSSIN DE SECURITE GONFLABLE DANS UNE PLANCHE DE BORD COMPORTANT UN VOLET RELIE A LA PLANCHE DE BORD PAR UN LIEN LINEAIRE | [2014/44] |
Former [2013/05] | AUFBLASBARE AIRBAGANORDNUNG AUF EINEM ARMATURENBRETT MIT EINER ÜBER EINE LINEARE VERBINDUNG MIT DEM ARMATURENBRETT VERBUNDENEN KLAPPE | ||
Former [2013/05] | INFLATABLE AIRBAG ARRANGEMENT IN A DASHBOARD, COMPRISING A FLAP CONNECTED TO THE DASHBOARD BY MEANS OF A LINEAR LINK | ||
Former [2013/05] | AGENCEMENT DE COUSSIN DE SECURITE GONFLABLE DANS UNE PLANCHE DE BORD COMPORTANT UN VOLET RELIE A LA PLANCHE DE BORD PAR UN LIEN LINEAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 27.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2011 | AL | 29.10.2014 | AT | 29.10.2014 | BG | 29.10.2014 | CY | 29.10.2014 | CZ | 29.10.2014 | DK | 29.10.2014 | EE | 29.10.2014 | ES | 29.10.2014 | FI | 29.10.2014 | HR | 29.10.2014 | IT | 29.10.2014 | LT | 29.10.2014 | LV | 29.10.2014 | MC | 29.10.2014 | MK | 29.10.2014 | MT | 29.10.2014 | NL | 29.10.2014 | PL | 29.10.2014 | RO | 29.10.2014 | RS | 29.10.2014 | SE | 29.10.2014 | SI | 29.10.2014 | SK | 29.10.2014 | SM | 29.10.2014 | TR | 29.10.2014 | NO | 29.01.2015 | GR | 30.01.2015 | IS | 28.02.2015 | PT | 02.03.2015 | GB | 23.03.2015 | IE | 23.03.2015 | LU | 23.03.2015 | BE | 31.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AT | 29.10.2014 | ||
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MK | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 23.03.2011 | |
AT | 29.10.2014 | ||
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
GB | 23.03.2015 | ||
IE | 23.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
LU | 23.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 29.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5306042 (FRANK FREDERICK W [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]US5398960 (RAVENBERG MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0695671 (MORTON INT INC [US]) [A] 2,3 * abstract * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 41 *; | [A]JPH0891163 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0036] *; | [A]US2003020269 (MUHLBACH STEFFEN [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0013]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2003184058 (GRAY JOHN D [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0044]; figure 5 *; | [A]US2003184063 (YASUDA MITSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0057]; figures 4-7 *; | [AD]US2005127642 (WEISSERT ULRICH [US], et al) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0033]; figures 2-4,6 *; | [A]US2005167953 (WEISSERT ULRICH [US]) [A] 5 * abstract *; | [A]US2008012273 (COWELCHUK GLENN A [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0022] , [0024] , [0027] , [0030]; figures 1,2,4-7 *; | [A]DE102008039552 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0040]; figure 4 * | by applicant | US2005127642 |