Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8980032 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2015 | B2 | US2013098539 | 25.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP01478 | 24.03.2011 | FR1052232 | 26.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5715232B | Global Dossier | 07.05.2015 | B2 | JP2013523480 | 17.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP01478 | 24.03.2011 | FR1052232 | 26.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102821935B | Global Dossier | 05.08.2015 | B | CN102821935 | 12.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP01478 | 24.03.2011 | FR1052232 | 26.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2793767 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2015 | C | CA2793767 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP01478 | 24.03.2011 | FR1052232 | 26.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2552677 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2016 | B1 | EP2552677 | 06.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP01478 | 24.03.2011 | FR1052232 | 26.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112012023844 | 24.09.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP01478 | 24.03.2011 | FR1052232 | 26.03.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2526457 | 20.08.2014 | C2 | RU2012145553 | 10.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2011EP01478 | 24.03.2011 | FR1052232 | 26.03.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011116966 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1052232 | 26.03.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2957845 | 10.08.2012 | B1 | FR2957845 | 30.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1052232 | 26.03.2010 |