EP2523823 - POWER TRANSMISSION SYSTEM AND POWER SUPPLY DEVICE FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states National University Corporation Nagoya Institute of Technology 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 466-0061 / JP | [2015/43] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states National University Corporation Nagoya Institute of Technology 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 466-0061 / JP | |||
Former [2012/47] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
For all designated states National University Corporation Nagoya Institute of Technology 29, Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho Showa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 466-0061 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ICHIKAWA, Shinji c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken471-8571 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Tetsuhiro c/o Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha of 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
HIRAYAMA, Hiroshi c/o National University Corporation Nagoya Institute Of Technology of 29 Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho, Showa-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 466-0061 / JP | 04 /
KIKUMA, Nobuyoshi c/o National University Corporation Nagoya Institute Of Technology of 29 Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho, Showa-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 466-0061 / JP | 05 /
SAKAKIBARA, Kunio c/o National University Corporation Nagoya Institute Of Technology of 29 Aza Kiichi Gokiso-cho, Showa-ku, Nagoya-shi Aichi 466-0061 / JP | [2012/47] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2012/47] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11711994.1 | 10.01.2011 | [2015/43] | WO2011IB00019 | Priority number, date | JP20100003998 | 12.01.2010 Original published format: JP 2010003998 | [2012/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011086445 | Date: | 21.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2523823 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2523823 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18, H02J5/00 | [2015/22] | CPC: |
B60L53/126 (EP,US);
B60L53/12 (US);
H02J50/12 (EP,US);
H02J50/70 (EP,US);
H02J50/80 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/47] | B60L11/18, H02J17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM UND STROMZUFUHRVORRICHTUNG FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2012/47] | English: | POWER TRANSMISSION SYSTEM AND POWER SUPPLY DEVICE FOR VEHICLES | [2012/47] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION ÉLECTRIQUE ET DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION ÉLECTRIQUE POUR VÉHICULES | [2012/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 14.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2011 | AL | 21.10.2015 | AT | 21.10.2015 | BE | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | IT | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MK | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | RS | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | SM | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | IE | 10.01.2016 | LU | 10.01.2016 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | MT | 31.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 10.01.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 10.01.2016 | ||
LU | 10.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 10.01.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 10.01.2016 | ||
LU | 10.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
MT | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 10.01.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 10.01.2016 | ||
LU | 10.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 10.01.2011 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MK | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 10.01.2016 | ||
LU | 10.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 10.01.2016 | ||
LU | 10.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 10.01.2016 | ||
LU | 10.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
LU | 10.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
LU | 10.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
LU | 10.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
LU | 10.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
LU | 10.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RS | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07337035 (NIPPON ELECTRIC IND, et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JPH08175232 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [A]US5592367 (SUGIMORI KATSUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH11225401 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2002272134 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [A]JP2003250233 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2008138863 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5 * page 3, line 12 - line 23 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]JP2009106136 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-5 * abstract *; | US2011156833 [ ] (BOEHM ALFRED [DE], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0014] * * figure 2 * | by applicant | JPH01225401 | JPH07337035 | JPH08175232 | JPH11225401 | JP2002272134 | JP2003250233 | JP2009106136 |