EP2553347 - METHOD FOR CLIMATE CONTROL IN BUILDINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biologische Insel Lothar Moll GmbH & Co. KG Rheintalstrasse 35-43 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | [2013/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOLL, Lothar Rheintalstrasse 39 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | [2013/06] | Representative(s) | Thews, Karl STT Sozietät Thews & Thews Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 32 68165 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/06] | Thews, Karl STT Sozietät Thews & Thews Patentanwälte Augustaanlage 32 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 11712224.2 | 28.03.2011 | WO2011EP54745 | Priority number, date | DE20101013085 | 26.03.2010 Original published format: DE102010013085 | [2013/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011117422 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2553347 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F24F7/007, F24F11/00, F24F11/053 | [2013/06] | CPC: |
F24F11/0001 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/46 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/62 (KR);
F24F11/74 (EP,US);
F24F11/755 (KR);
F24F11/76 (EP,KR,US);
F24F7/007 (EP,KR,US);
F24F2011/0004 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KLIMATISIEREN VON GEBÄUDEN | [2013/06] | English: | METHOD FOR CLIMATE CONTROL IN BUILDINGS | [2013/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CLIMATISATION DE BÂTIMENTS | [2013/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/06] | 28.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5348077 (HILLMAN CHRIS F [US]) [A] 1,12* abstract *; | [A]US2008250800 (WETZEL LAWRENCE E [US]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * | by applicant | DE202007012044U | DE202007018549U | DE102008057787 |