Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2543179 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201180018068 CN201610418505 EP11712236 EP16207628 EP19186594 EP2011054881W US201514677569 US201916570188 US202217959959 US84329310



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023022815Global Dossier 26.01.2023A1
Priority number Date
US84329310 26.07.2010
GB201005458 31.03.2010
US201916570188 13.09.2019
US201514677569 02.04.2015
US202217959959 04.10.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11496427Global Dossier 08.11.2022B2
US2020084167 12.03.2020A1
Priority number Date
US84329310 26.07.2010
GB201005458 31.03.2010
US201916570188 13.09.2019
US201514677569 02.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10454862Global Dossier 22.10.2019B2
US2015215250 30.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
US84329310 26.07.2010
GB201005458 31.03.2010
US201514677569 02.04.2015
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3576395Global Dossier 08.01.2025B1
EP3576395 04.12.2019A1
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
WO2011EP54881 30.03.2011
EP11712236 30.03.2011
EP16207628 30.03.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3229452Global Dossier 17.07.2019B1
EP3229452 11.10.2017A1
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
WO2011EP54881 30.03.2011
EP11712236 30.03.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN105915976Global Dossier 31.08.2016A
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
CN201180018068 30.03.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN102823238BGlobal Dossier 03.08.2016B
CN102823238 12.12.2012A
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
WO2011EP54881 30.03.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2543179Global Dossier 19.04.2017B1
EP2543179 09.01.2013A1
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
WO2011EP54881 30.03.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK3229452T 16.09.2019T3
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
EP11712236 30.03.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DK3576395T 17.02.2025T3
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
EP16207628 30.03.2011
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2634035T 26.09.2017T3
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
WO2011EP54881 30.03.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2011121006Global Dossier 06.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US8998720Global Dossier 07.04.2015B2
US2011244955 06.10.2011A1
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2744567T 25.02.2020T3
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FI3576395T 17.02.2025T3
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB201005458D0 19.05.2010D0
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT3229452T 23.09.2019T
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
PT3576395T 06.02.2025T
Priority number Date
GB201005458 31.03.2010
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3229452
 EP3576395