EP2555865 - LACTONE PREPARATION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/07] | METHOD FOR PREPARING A LACTONE | ||
[2014/11] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 40, rue de la Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | For all designated states Rhodia Operations 40 rue de la Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACQUOT, Roland 15 rue des Pinsons F-69340 Francheville / FR | 02 /
MARION, Philippe 140 Route du Buye F-69390 Vernaison / FR | [2013/07] | Representative(s) | Menville, Laure, et al Rhodia Opérations IAM 85, avenue des frères Perret 69192 Saint-Fons / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | Blanchard, Isabelle Jackie Rhodia Operations Direction de la Propriété Industrielle CRTL, BP62 85 rue des Frères Perret 69192 Saint-Fons Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 11712551.8 | 05.04.2011 | WO2011EP55289 | Priority number, date | FR20100001431 | 07.04.2010 Original published format: FR 1001431 | [2013/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011124578 | Date: | 13.10.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2555865 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/14, B01J23/62, B01J23/46, C07D307/33, C07D305/00, B01J37/02, B01J37/03, B01J37/18 | [2013/07] | CPC: |
B01J21/04 (EP,US);
C07D309/10 (KR);
C07D307/33 (US);
B01J21/063 (EP,US);
B01J21/08 (EP,US);
B01J23/46 (KR);
B01J23/62 (KR);
B01J23/626 (EP,US);
B01J35/40 (EP,US);
B01J35/51 (EP,US);
B01J37/0201 (EP,US);
B01J37/0213 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/07] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES LATONES | [2014/11] | English: | LACTONE PREPARATION PROCESS | [2014/11] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE LACTONE | [2013/07] |
Former [2013/07] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LACTONS | ||
Former [2013/07] | METHOD FOR PREPARING A LACTONE | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/07] | 12.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 19.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 06.10.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 06.10.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.11.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2016 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9622832 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR], et al) [X] 13-21 * page 2, lines 1-17 * * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 14 * * page 6, line 1 - page 8, line 30 * * examples 1,2 * [A] 1-12,22; | [XA]FR2740708 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [X] 13-21 * page 2, line 15 - page 6, line 3 * * claim - * [A] 1-12,22; | [XA]WO9717135 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR], et al) [X] 13-21 * abstract * * page 2, line 7 - page 6, line 8 * * page 6, lines 15-30 * * claim - * [A] 1-12,22; | [A]US5985789 (TOOLEY PATRICIA ANN [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [XA]FR2787791 (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR]) [X] 13-21 * page 4, line 20 - page 5, line 23 * * page 6, lines 1-11 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 13 * * claims 2-11 * [A] 1-12,22; | [XI]JP3704728B (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-6,13,17-22 * abstract * * example - * [I] 7-12,14-16; | [A] - SILVA A M ET AL, "Role of catalyst preparation on determining selective sites for hydrogenation of dimethyl adipate over RuSn/Al2O3", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS. A, CHEMICAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.MOLCATA.2006.03.005, vol. 253, no. 1-2, ISSN 1381-1169, (20060701), pages 62 - 69, (20060701), XP025156327 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcata.2006.03.005 | Examination | - SILVA A M ET AL, "Role of catalyst preparation on determining selective sites for hydrogenation of dimethyl adipate over RuSn/Al2O3", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 253, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.MOLCATA.2006.03.005, ISSN 1381-1169, (20060701), pages 62 - 69, (20060701), XP028015697 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcata.2006.03.005 | by applicant | GB583344 | DE19745442 | US6838577 | - BRUNEAU-EMMETT-TELLER, THE JOURNAL OF AMERICAN SOCIETY, (1938), vol. 60, page 309 |