EP2544633 - ARTHRODESIS IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADSM 14 chemin de la Place 01800 Saint-Maurice-de-Gourdans / FR | [2016/43] |
Former [2013/03] | For all designated states Synchro Medical 21 rue des Merisiers 68920 Wettolsheim Les Erlen / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AVEROUS, Christophe 4 rue du Zinkenthal F-67206 Mittelhausbergen / FR | 02 /
CERMOLACCE, Christophe 118 rue Jean Mermoz F-13008 Marseille / FR | 03 /
DETERME, Patrice 67 Chemin des Clotasses F-31400 Toulouse / FR | 04 /
DIEBOLD, Patrice 61 rue Jacquinot F-54000 Nancy / FR | 05 /
GUILLO, Stéphane 28 rue Ernest Renan F-33000 Bordeaux / FR | 06 /
ROCHER, Hubert 90 Avenue Bougnard F-33600 Pessac / FR | 07 /
ROY, Christophe Les Trouillons Papelissier F-26300 Chatuzange le Goubet / FR | [2013/03] | Representative(s) | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2014/11] |
Former [2013/03] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 11712977.5 | 08.03.2011 | WO2011FR50473 | Priority number, date | FR20100051673 | 09.03.2010 Original published format: FR 1051673 | [2013/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011110784 | Date: | 15.09.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2544633 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2544633 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/42 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
A61B17/7266 (EP,US);
A61F2/42 (US);
A61B17/7283 (EP,US);
A61B17/7291 (EP,US);
A61F2/4225 (EP,US);
A61F2/4241 (EP,US);
A61B17/7225 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30062 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30112 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30171 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30172 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30181 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30571 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30594 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30622 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30904 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4228 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4243 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2230/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARTHRODESEIMPLANTAT | [2013/03] | English: | ARTHRODESIS IMPLANT | [2013/03] | French: | IMPLANT D'ARTHRODESE | [2013/03] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2012 | Examination requested [2013/03] | 12.08.2014 | Observations by third parties | 17.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.2015
21.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE In2Bones 28 Chemin du Petit-Bois 69130 Ecully / FR Opponent's representative Weber, Jean-François Cabinet Didier Martin Les Terrasses des Bruyères -Bâtiment C 314 C Allée des Noisetiers 69760 Limonest / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.2015
21.08.2015
ADMISSIBLE In2Bones 28 Chemin du Petit-Bois 69130 Ecully / FR Opponent's representative Weber, Jean-François Cabinet Didier Martin 50 Chemin des Verrières 69260 Charbonnieres Les Bains / FR | ||
Former [2015/39] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.08.2015
In2Bones 28 Chemin du Petit-Bois 69130 Ecully / FR Opponent's representative Martin, Didier Roland Valéry Cabinet Didier Martin 50, chemin des Verrières 69260 Charbonnières-les Bains / FR | 25.09.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.04.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.06.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.06.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 12.10.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/51] | Appeal following opposition | 04.08.2017 | Appeal received No. T1743/17 | 12.10.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2011 | AL | 19.11.2014 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | HR | 19.11.2014 | LT | 19.11.2014 | LV | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | MK | 19.11.2014 | MT | 19.11.2014 | NL | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | RS | 19.11.2014 | SE | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | SM | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | NO | 19.02.2015 | GR | 20.02.2015 | LU | 08.03.2015 | IS | 19.03.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | AT | 08.03.2017 | IE | 08.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 08.03.2011 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MK | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | HU | 08.03.2011 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 08.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | HU | 08.03.2011 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
IE | 08.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | HU | 08.03.2011 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
AT | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 08.03.2011 | |
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.03.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | CY | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 19.11.2014 | |
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 19.11.2014 | |
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 19.11.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1805665 (SMIDT DR TOMISLAV) [A] 1-12* figures 3-5 *; | [A]US7041106 (CARVER ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 9 *; | [A]WO2006109004 (MEMOMETAL TECHNOLOGIES [FR], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 4, line 25 - page 7, line 27 *; | [AD]FR2913876 (MEMOMETAL TECHNOLOGIES SOC PAR [FR]) [AD] 1-12 * page 6, line 10 - page 7, line 24 * |