EP2550806 - SECURE NETWORK CODING FOR MULTI-RESOLUTION WIRELESS VIDEO STREAMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | For all designated states Universidade Do Porto Praça Gomes Teixeira s/n 4099-002 Porto / PT | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/05] | For all designated states Massachusetts Institute of Technology 77 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIMA, Luisa Rua Antonio Bessa Leite 1562-3 P-4150-074 Porto / PT | 02 /
GHEORGHIU, Steluta C/ Cinturon de la Plana 115 Can Canonge E-08757 Corbera de Llobregat / ES | 03 /
BARROS, Joao Faculdade de Engenharia da Universidade do Porto Departamento de Engenharia Electrotecnica e de Computadores Rua Dr. Roberto Frias s/n P-4200-465 Porto / PT | 04 /
MEDARD, Muriel 45 Evergreen Way Belmont, Massachusetts 02478 / US | 05 /
Lopez Toledo, Alberto 809 President Street, Apt 1 Brooklyn NY 11215 / US | 06 /
DA SILVA MACHADO GARCIA VILELA, Joao Paulo Pct. Alvaro do Ceu Oliveira 74, 8.2 4425-017 AGUAS SANTAS, MAIA / PT | [2016/08] |
Former [2013/05] | 01 /
LIMA, Luisa Rua Antonio Bessa Leite 1562-3 P-4150-074 Porto / PT | ||
02 /
GHEORGHIU, Steluta C/ Cinturon de la Plana 115 Can Canonge E-08757 Corbera de Llobregat / ES | |||
03 /
BARROS, Joao Faculdade de Engenharia da Universidade do Porto Departamento de Engenharia Electrotecnica e de Computadores Rua Dr. Roberto Frias s/n P-4200-465 Porto / PT | |||
04 /
MEDARD, Muriel 45 Evergreen Way Belmont, Massachusetts 02478 / US | |||
05 /
Lopez Toledo, Alberto 809 President Street, Apt 1 Brooklyn NY 11215 / US | Representative(s) | Perian, Priscilla Ludivine Innovincia 11, avenue des Tilleuls 74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR | [2013/15] |
Former [2013/05] | Croonenbroek, Thomas Jakob Cabinet Innovincia 11, avenue des Tilleuls 74200 Thonon-les-Bains / FR | Application number, filing date | 11713559.0 | 25.03.2011 | [2019/20] | WO2011US29908 | Priority number, date | US20100317532P | 25.03.2010 Original published format: US 317532 P | [2013/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011119909 | Date: | 29.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2550806 | Date: | 30.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2550806 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L29/06, H04L9/08, H04N21/2343, H04N21/2347, H04N21/266, H04N21/2662, H04N21/61, H04N21/6377, H04N21/647, H04N7/167, H04W12/06, // H04L1/00 | [2019/01] | CPC: |
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04L63/0428 (US);
H04L9/0819 (US);
H04N21/234327 (EP,US);
H04N21/2347 (EP,US);
H04N21/26613 (EP,US);
H04N21/2662 (EP,US);
H04N21/6131 (EP,US);
H04N21/6377 (EP,US);
H04N21/64792 (EP,US);
H04N7/167 (US);
H04W12/069 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/05] | H04N7/24, H04N7/167, H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERE NETZWERKCODIERUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSES VIDEOSTREAMING MIT MEHREREN AUFLÖSUNGEN | [2013/05] | English: | SECURE NETWORK CODING FOR MULTI-RESOLUTION WIRELESS VIDEO STREAMING | [2013/05] | French: | CODAGE DE RÉSEAU SÉCURISÉ POUR UNE DIFFUSION DE DONNÉES VIDÉO EN CONTINU SANS FIL MULTI-RÉSOLUTION | [2013/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/05] | 13.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2011 | AL | 15.05.2019 | AT | 15.05.2019 | CY | 15.05.2019 | CZ | 15.05.2019 | DK | 15.05.2019 | EE | 15.05.2019 | FI | 15.05.2019 | HR | 15.05.2019 | IT | 15.05.2019 | LT | 15.05.2019 | LV | 15.05.2019 | MC | 15.05.2019 | MK | 15.05.2019 | MT | 15.05.2019 | PL | 15.05.2019 | RO | 15.05.2019 | RS | 15.05.2019 | SE | 15.05.2019 | SI | 15.05.2019 | SK | 15.05.2019 | SM | 15.05.2019 | TR | 15.05.2019 | BG | 15.08.2019 | NO | 15.08.2019 | GR | 16.08.2019 | IS | 15.09.2019 | PT | 15.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
IS | 15.09.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.03.2011 | |
AL | 15.05.2019 | ||
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CY | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
MT | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
MC | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
PL | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SI | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
TR | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
SM | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
IT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
EE | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
SK | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
AT | 15.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RO | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
CZ | 15.05.2019 | ||
DK | 15.05.2019 | ||
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
BG | 15.08.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
LV | 15.05.2019 | ||
RS | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
GR | 16.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 15.05.2019 | |
FI | 15.05.2019 | ||
HR | 15.05.2019 | ||
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 15.05.2019 | |
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
SE | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | ||
PT | 15.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 15.05.2019 | |
LT | 15.05.2019 | ||
NO | 15.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI] - LIMA L ET AL, "Towards secure multiresolution network coding", NETWORKING AND INFORMATION THEORY, 2009. ITW 2009. IEEE INFORMATION THEORY WORKSHOP ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090612), ISBN 978-1-4244-4535-6, pages 125 - 129, XP031485643 [X] 14-18 * abstract * * page 125, right-hand column, lines 40-43 * * page 126, left-hand column, lines 20-23 * * page 127, right-hand column * * section C * * table 1 * * figures 1-5 * [I] 1-13,19 | [XP] - LIMA L ET AL, "Secure network coding for multi-resolution wireless video streaming", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (20100401), vol. 28, no. 3, ISSN 0733-8716, pages 377 - 388, XP011305476 [XP] 1-19 * sections I, II and III * * table 1 * * figures 1-5 * | [A] - HALLOUSH M ET AL, "Network Coding with Multi-Generation Mixing: Analysis and Applications for Video Communication", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, 2008 : ICC '08 ; 19 - 23 MAY 2008, BEIJING, CHINA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080519), ISBN 978-1-4244-2075-9, pages 198 - 202, XP031265365 [A] 1-19 * section II * | [A] - CHUNHUA LI ET AL, "Robust and Flexible Scalable Video Multicast with Network Coding over P2P Network", IMAGE AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2009. CISP '09. 2ND INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20091017), ISBN 978-1-4244-4129-7, pages 1 - 5, XP031553780 [A] 1-19 * sections 2 and 3 * | [A] - VILELA J P ET AL, "Lightweight Security for Network Coding", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, 2008 : ICC '08 ; 19 - 23 MAY 2008, BEIJING, CHINA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080519), ISBN 978-1-4244-2075-9, pages 1750 - 1754, XP031265657 [A] 1-19 * abstract * | [A] - MAGLI E ET AL, "An overview of network coding for multimedia streaming", MULTIMEDIA AND EXPO, 2009. ICME 2009. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090628), ISBN 978-1-4244-4290-4, pages 1488 - 1491, XP031511041 [A] 1-19 * abstract * | by applicant | - "Using layered video to provide incentives in p2p live streaming", Z. LIU, Y. SHEN, S. S. PANWAR, K. W. ROSS, Y. WANG, P2P-TV '07: Proceedings of the 2007 workshop on Peer-to-peer streaming and IP-TV, ACM, (2007), pages 311 - 316 |