EP2547874 - SWITCHING ROCKER ARM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, OH 44114-2594 / US | [2013/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZURFACE, Austin 619 Indian Hills Drive Hastings Michigan 49058 / US | 02 /
RADULESCU, Andrei, Dan 15299 Walters Drive Marshall Michigan 49068 / US | 03 /
CECUR, Majo Corso Vittorio Veneto 29 I-10086 Rivarolo Canavese (TO) / IT | 04 /
KLINE, Philip, M. 2362 E. Jackson Road Tekonsha Michigan 40092 / US | 05 /
GORDON, Tony 2191 Cluster Springs Road South Boston Virginia 24592 / US | 06 /
SHEREN, James R. 10232 Benton Road Grand Ledge Michigan 48837 / US | [2013/04] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/04] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street GB-London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11714157.2 | 18.03.2011 | WO2011US29065 | Priority number, date | US20100315464P | 19.03.2010 Original published format: US 315464 P | [2013/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011116331 | Date: | 22.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2547874 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2547874 | Date: | 08.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/18, F01L13/00 | [2013/04] | CPC: |
F01L1/185 (EP,US);
F01L13/0005 (EP,US);
F01L13/0036 (EP,US);
F01L1/2405 (EP);
F01L2001/186 (EP);
F01L2001/467 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KIPPHEBEL MIT UMSCHALTFUNKTION | [2013/04] | English: | SWITCHING ROCKER ARM | [2013/04] | French: | CULBUTEUR COMMUTABLE | [2013/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2012 | Examination requested [2013/04] | 30.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2011 | AL | 08.10.2014 | AT | 08.10.2014 | BE | 08.10.2014 | BG | 08.10.2014 | CY | 08.10.2014 | CZ | 08.10.2014 | DK | 08.10.2014 | EE | 08.10.2014 | ES | 08.10.2014 | FI | 08.10.2014 | HR | 08.10.2014 | LT | 08.10.2014 | LV | 08.10.2014 | MC | 08.10.2014 | MK | 08.10.2014 | MT | 08.10.2014 | NL | 08.10.2014 | RO | 08.10.2014 | RS | 08.10.2014 | SI | 08.10.2014 | SK | 08.10.2014 | SM | 08.10.2014 | TR | 08.10.2014 | NO | 08.01.2015 | GR | 09.01.2015 | IS | 08.02.2015 | PT | 09.02.2015 | IE | 18.03.2015 | LU | 18.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.03.2011 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MK | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 18.03.2011 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BE | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 18.03.2011 | |
AT | 08.10.2014 | ||
BG | 08.10.2014 | ||
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
SM | 08.10.2014 | ||
TR | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
MT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SI | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
IE | 18.03.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
LU | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
MC | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
SK | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RO | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
DK | 08.10.2014 | ||
EE | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
CY | 08.10.2014 | ||
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 08.10.2014 | |
ES | 08.10.2014 | ||
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
HR | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
LV | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
RS | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
GR | 09.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 08.10.2014 | |
FI | 08.10.2014 | ||
LT | 08.10.2014 | ||
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
IS | 08.02.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
PT | 09.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
NO | 08.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 08.10.2014 | |
NL | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | NL | 08.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102004017103 (INA SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0025]; figure - *; | [A]DE102006046573 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]EP1785595 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]DE102006057895 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US2007039573 (DEIERLEIN MATTHEW J [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * | by applicant | US19640613154 |