EP2564476 - MALE CONNECTOR AND A METHOD OF PRODUCING THE MALE CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical Systems AB Box 6350 751 35 Uppsala / SE | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHLIN, Fredrik Fågelbo 19 S-755 92 Uppsala / SE | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Brann AB P.O. Box 3690 Sveavägen 63 103 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Brann AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2013/10] | Holmberg, Nils Anders Patrik BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 11714766.0 | 14.04.2011 | WO2011EP55920 | Priority number, date | US20100329630P | 30.04.2010 Original published format: US 329630 P | SE20100050429 | 30.04.2010 Original published format: SE 1050429 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011134801 | Date: | 03.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2564476 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2564476 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01R24/58, // H01R43/16, H01R43/24 | [2014/39] | CPC: |
H01R24/58 (EP,US);
A61B1/00112 (SE);
A61B5/0215 (SE);
A61M25/09 (SE);
H01R2201/12 (EP,US);
H01R43/16 (EP,US);
H01R43/24 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49213 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4922 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49222 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/10] | H01R103/00, H01R105/00, H01R24/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STECKVERBINDER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES STECKVERBINDERS | [2013/10] | English: | MALE CONNECTOR AND A METHOD OF PRODUCING THE MALE CONNECTOR | [2013/10] | French: | CONNECTEUR MÂLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DU CONNECTEUR MÂLE | [2013/10] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/10] | 18.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.04.2011 | AL | 14.01.2015 | AT | 14.01.2015 | BE | 14.01.2015 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | ES | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | HR | 14.01.2015 | IT | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MK | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | NL | 14.01.2015 | PL | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | RS | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | SM | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | IE | 14.04.2015 | LU | 14.04.2015 | NO | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | CH | 30.04.2015 | LI | 30.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | PT | 14.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.04.2011 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MK | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
PT | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 14.04.2011 | |
AT | 14.01.2015 | ||
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
PT | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
BE | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 30.04.2015 | ||
LI | 30.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
IT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/52] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
NL | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RS | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 14.01.2015 | |
ES | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 14.01.2015 | |
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 14.01.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6439933 (MOJI EIRO [JP]); | [Y]US2004186542 (VAN VENROOIJ PAUL [NL], et al); | [XY]US2008160843 (CHEN WU-KUANG [TW], et al); | [XY]WO2009091495 (APPLE INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2009254162 (QUINCI THOMAS [US], et al) | by applicant | US6090052 | US6196980 | US6908442 |